EP3508962 - TOUCH PANEL STACKUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TPK Touch Solutions Inc. 6F. No. 13-18, Sec. 6 Min Quan E. Rd. Neihu Dist. Taipei City 114 Taiwan / TW | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chen-Yu 10F No.25 Lane 239 Longcih Rd., Jhongli City 320 Taoyuan County / TW | 02 /
LIU, Cheng-Ping No.18 Ln.38 Chengdu Rd. Zhongli City 320 Taoyuan County / TW | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 19158988.6 | 14.03.2011 | [2019/28] | Priority number, date | US201094205610 | 09.11.2010 Original published format: US 94205610 | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508962 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044, G06F3/01 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/0446 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (CN);
G06F3/016 (US);
G06F3/0443 (KR);
G06F2203/04103 (KR);
G06F2203/04111 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMSTAPEL | [2019/28] | English: | TOUCH PANEL STACKUP | [2019/28] | French: | EMPILEMENT DE PANNEAUX TACTILES | [2019/28] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 07.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.02.2023 | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/27] | 27.02.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/27] | 28.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11840619.8 / EP2638454 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008165139 (HOTELLING STEVE PORTER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1A * * paragraph [0016] *; | [A]EP2090966 (TPK TOUCH SOLUTIONS INC [TW]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * figure 6 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * * paragraph [0035] ** paragraphs [0037] - [0038] *; | [XI]WO2009157645 (WORLDVISION CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0048] * [I] 6,14; | EP2306278 [ ] (WORLDVISION CO LTD [KR]) [ ] * EP family member used as official trabslation * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0050] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0066] * |