EP3537370 - METHOD FOR SETTING UP A SURVEILLANCE ZONE IN A GOODS LOGISTICS FACILITY AND LOCATION SYSTEM FOR A GOODS LOGISTICS FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grabbe, Florian Klewerkoppel 11 22335 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Ahrens, Stefan Mühlenstraße 34 25462 Rellingen / DE | 03 /
Heise, Sven-Ole Aukamp 46 24783 Osterrönfeld / DE | 04 /
Kopelke, Jan Alsterdorfer Straße 537 22337 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
Altmann, Tony Sandkoppel 13 24616 Brokstedt / DE | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 19159007.4 | 25.02.2019 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | DE201810104998 | 05.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018104998 | [2019/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537370 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06Q50/28 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
G06Q50/00 (EP,US);
B65G1/00 (CN);
G01S7/4004 (US);
B65G1/0492 (CN);
G01S13/0209 (US);
G01S13/56 (US);
G01S5/02 (CN);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/33 (US);
B65G2203/04 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINRICHTEN EINER ÜBERWACHUNGSZONE IN EINER WARENLOGISTIKEINRICHTUNG UND ORTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE WARENLOGISTIKEINRICHTUNG | [2019/37] | English: | METHOD FOR SETTING UP A SURVEILLANCE ZONE IN A GOODS LOGISTICS FACILITY AND LOCATION SYSTEM FOR A GOODS LOGISTICS FACILITY | [2019/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN PLACE D'UNE ZONE DE SURVEILLANCE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE LOGISTIQUE DE MARCHANDISES ET SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE LOGISTIQUE DE MARCHANDISES | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 06.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 28.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2500871 (RAYMOND CORP [US]); | [I]EP2784535 (INSTA ELEKTRO GMBH [DE]); | [I]EP2851331 (STILL GMBH [DE]); | [I]DE102015122149 (AMMANN SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) |