EP3540171 - BOTTOM RAIL FOR USE WITH AN ARCHITECTURAL-STRUCTURE COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunter Douglas Inc. One Blue Hill Plaza Pearl River, New York 10965 / US | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mcneill, David B. c/o Hunter Douglas Industries BV P.O. Box 5072 2 Piekstraat 3008 AB Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
Van der Kolk, Nicholas E. c/o Hunter Douglas Industries BV P.O. Box 5072 2 Piekstraat 3008 AB Rotterdam / NL | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19159170.0 | 25.02.2019 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | US201862635190P | 26.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862635190 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3540171 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3540171 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/42, A47H23/01 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
E06B9/42 (EP,KR,US);
E06B9/32 (US);
A47H23/01 (EP,US);
E06B9/34 (EP,US);
E06B9/388 (EP,US);
E06B9/56 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERE SCHIENE ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINER ABDECKUNG EINER ARCHITEKTONISCHEN STRUKTUR | [2019/38] | English: | BOTTOM RAIL FOR USE WITH AN ARCHITECTURAL-STRUCTURE COVERING | [2019/38] | French: | RAIL INFÉRIEUR À UTILISER AVEC UN REVÊTEMENT DE STRUCTURE ARCHITECTURALE | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 18.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2020 | Observations by third parties | 10.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5957610 (METAKO KIGYO KK) [A] 12-15* figure 6 *; | [X]JPS6034290U (-) [X] 12,13 * figure 4 *; | [X]EP1384849 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) [X] 12-15 * paragraph [0001]; figures 3A,3B *; | [A]US2012097346 (NG PHILIP [CA]) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *; | [XA]JP2017206875 (TACHIKAWA BLIND MFG) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0065] , [0067] , [0071] , [0074]; figures 5,6,8 * [A] 3-11 |