EP3530421 - MACHINING SYSTEM WITH OPTIMAL PATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTY, Nathan 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 19159214.6 | 25.02.2019 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | US201815904554 | 26.02.2018 Original published format: US201815904554 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530421 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3530421 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B25J9/1664 (EP,US);
G05B19/19 (CN);
B25J9/1687 (US);
B23Q16/00 (US);
B23Q17/2233 (US);
B23Q9/0042 (US);
B25J9/1669 (US);
B64F5/50 (US);
G05B19/31 (US);
G05B19/402 (US);
B64F5/10 (US);
G05B19/4097 (US);
G05B2219/31281 (US);
G05B2219/35349 (CN);
G05B2219/40523 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP);
Y10S901/02 (US);
Y10T29/49778 (US);
Y10T29/4978 (US);
Y10T29/53048 (US);
Y10T29/53052 (US);
Y10T29/53061 (US);
Y10T29/53065 (US);
Y10T408/03 (US);
Y10T408/173 (US);
Y10T408/175 (US);
Y10T483/10 (US);
Y10T483/1736 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | BEARBEITUNGSSYSTEM MIT OPTIMALEN WEGEN | [2019/35] | English: | MACHINING SYSTEM WITH OPTIMAL PATHS | [2019/35] | French: | SYSTÈME D'USINAGE DOTÉ DE TRAJETS OPTIMAUX | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2022 | 24.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016378093 (FREEMAN PHILIP L [US], et al); | [IP]EP3335843 (BOEING CO [US]) |