EP3514543 - QUANTITATIVE CONTROLS AND CALIBRATORS FOR CELLULAR ANALYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Cell Standards LLC 800 Washington Street Box 115 Boston, MA 02111 / US | [2020/10] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Medical Discovery Partners LLC 800 Washington Street Box 115 Boston, MA 02111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMPURAM, Seshi R 148 Winchester Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 02 /
BOGEN, Steven A 35 Cheryl Drive Sharon, MA 02067 / US | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19159269.0 | 07.11.2014 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | US201361901394P | 07.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361901394 P | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514543 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3514543 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
G01N1/30 (US);
G01N1/312 (US);
G01N2001/2893 (US);
G01N2496/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2019/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | QUANTITATIVE STEUERUNGEN UND KALIBRATOREN FÜR ZELLULÄRE ANALYTEN | [2019/30] | English: | QUANTITATIVE CONTROLS AND CALIBRATORS FOR CELLULAR ANALYTES | [2019/30] | French: | TÉMOINS QUANTITATIFS ET ÉTALONNEURS POUR ANALYTES CELLULAIRES | [2019/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 21.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14859458.3 / EP3065704 | Divisional application(s) | EP21165034.6 / EP3869196 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2014 | AL | 05.05.2021 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | IE | 07.11.2021 | LU | 07.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 07.11.2014 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0062064 (CYTOLOGIX CORP [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03089922 (AMERICAN NAT RED CROSS [US]) [A] 1-25 * example 1; claims 1-32 *; | [A]US2007141723 (SOMPURAM SESHI A [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0182]; claims 1-20 *; | [A]WO2012054901 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document * | by applicant | US6855490 | US7011940 | - RHODES, A. et al., "Evaluation of HER2/neu immunohistochemical assay sensitivity and scoring on formalin-fixed and paraffin-processed cell lines and breast tumors", Anat. Pathol., (20020000), vol. 118, pages 408 - 417 | - RHODES, A. et al., "A formalin-fixed, paraffin-processed cell line standard for quality control of immunohistochemical assay of HER-2/neu expression in breast cancer", Amer. J. Clin. Pathol., (20020000), vol. 117, doi:doi:10.1309/4NCM-QJ9W-QM0J-6QJE, pages 81 - 89, XP002660754 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1309/4NCM-QJ9W-QM0J-6QJE | - RIERA, J. et al., "Use of cultured cells as a control for quantitative immunocytochemical analysis of estrogen receptor in breast cancer", Amer. J. Clin. Pathol., (19990000), vol. 111, pages 329 - 335 | - HAMMOND, M. et al., "Standard reference material for Her2 testing: Report of a National Institute of Standards and Technology-sponsored consensus workshop", Appl. Immunohistochem. & Mol. Morphol., (20030000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 103 - 106 | - SOMPURAM, S; V KODELA; H RAMANATHAN; C WESCOTT; G RADCLIFFE; SA BOGEN, "Synthetic peptides identified from phage-displayed combinatorial libraries as immunodiagnostic assay surrogate quality control targets", Clin. Chem., (20020000), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 410 - 420 | - SOMPURAM, S; V KODELA; K ZHANG; H RAMANATHAN; G RADCLIFFE; P FALB; SA BOGEN, "A novel quality control slide for quantitative immunohistochemistry testing", J. Histochem. Cytochem., (20020000), vol. 50, pages 1425 - 34 | - SOMPURAM, S; V KODELA; H RAMANATHAN; C WESCOTT; G RADCLIFFE; SA BOGEN, "Synthetic peptides identified from phage-displayed combinatorial libraries as immunodiagnostic assay surrogate quality control targets", Clinical Chemistry, (20020000), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 410 - 420 | - SOMPURAM SR; K VANI; LJ HAFER; SA BOGEN, "Antibodies Immunoreactive With Formalin-Fixed Tissue Antigens Recognize Linear Protein Epitopes", Am. J. Clin. Pathol., (20060000), vol. 125, pages 82 - 90 | - A-S SCHROHL; H.C. PEDERSEN; S.S. JENSEN, "Human epidermal growth factor receptor 2 (HER2) immunoreactivity: specificity of three pharmacodiagnostic antibodies", Histopathology, (20110000), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2559.2011.04034.x, pages 975 - 983, XP002724736 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2559.2011.04034.x | - T SUGITA; M KATAYAMA; M OKOCHI; R KATO; T ICHIHARA; H HONDA, "Screening of peptide ligands that bind to the Fc region of IgG using peptide array and its application to affinity purification of antibody", Biochem Eng J, (20130000), vol. 79, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bej.2013.06.017, pages 33 - 40, XP028733013 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bej.2013.06.017 | - KING S.M.; QUARTUCCIO S.; HILLIARD T.S.; INOUE K.; BURDETTE J.E., "Alginate Hydrogels for Three-Dimensional Organ Culture of Ovaries and Oviducts", JoVE., vol. 52, (20110000), page 2, URL: http://www.jove.com/details.php?id=2804 | - S-R SHI; C LIU; J PEREZ; CR TAYLOR, "Protein-embedding Technique: A Potential Approach to Standardization of Immunohistochemistry for Formalin-fixed, Paraffin-embedded Tissue Sections", JHistochem Cytochem, (20050000), vol. 53, page 1168 | - MC MOTA; P CARVALHO; J RAMALHO; E LEITE, "Spectrophotometric analysis of sodium fluorescein aqueous solutions. Determination of molar absorption coefficient", International Ophthalmology, (19910000), vol. 15, pages 321 - 326 |