EP3518079 - DEVICES, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR PROVIDING FEEDBACK DURING INTERACTION WITH AN INTENSITY-SENSITIVE BUTTON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAUDHRI, Imran A. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 02 /
BAUER, Sebastian J. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 03 /
MOUSSETTE, Camille c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 04 /
MOUILLESEAUX, Jean-Pierre M. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 05 /
CORDIER, Madeleine S. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 06 /
KOPIN, Joshua B. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 19159727.7 | 31.08.2017 | [2019/31] | Priority number, date | US201662384180P | 06.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384180 P | DK2016PA70728 | 19.09.2016 Original published format: DK PA201670728 | US201615271194 | 20.09.2016 Original published format: US201615271194 | DK2016PA70738 | 20.09.2016 Original published format: DK PA201670738 | DK2016PA70739 | 20.09.2016 Original published format: DK PA201670739 | DK2016PA70740 | 20.09.2016 Original published format: DK PA201670740 | US201615272386 | 21.09.2016 Original published format: US201615272386 | US201615272398 | 21.09.2016 Original published format: US201615272398 | US201615273464 | 22.09.2016 Original published format: US201615273464 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518079 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/0483, G06F3/0485, G06F3/0488, G06F3/04883 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06F3/0483 (EP);
G06F3/0485 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | G06F3/01, G06F3/0483, G06F3/0485, G06F3/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND GRAFISCHE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON RÜCKMELDUNGEN WÄHREND DER INTERAKTION MIT EINEM INTENSITÄTSEMPFINDLICHEN KNOPF | [2019/31] | English: | DEVICES, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR PROVIDING FEEDBACK DURING INTERACTION WITH AN INTENSITY-SENSITIVE BUTTON | [2019/31] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, PROCÉDÉS ET INTERFACES UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUES POUR FOURNIR UNE RÉTROACTION PENDANT L'INTERACTION AVEC UN BOUTON SENSIBLE À L'INTENSITÉ | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 28.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17188831.6 / EP3291076 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009313543 (VANDER VEEN RAYMOND PAUL [CA], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0018] - [0024]; figures 3A-3C *; | [A] - Anonymous, "How to Disable Home Touch Vibration on LG G4", (20151206), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20151206144437/http://androidwidgetcenter.com/android-tips/disable-home-touch-vibration-lg-g4/, (20190517), XP055589748 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * |