EP3702809 - DEVICE NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVENS, Christoph Brugstraat 23 9190 Stekene / BE | 02 /
ZHAO, Hanqing Rue de l'été 95 1050 Ixelles / BE | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19159768.1 | 27.02.2019 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702809 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G01S17/93, G01S7/48 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
G01S17/89 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S7/4808 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGSNAVIGATION | [2020/36] | English: | DEVICE NAVIGATION | [2020/36] | French: | NAVIGATION DE DISPOSITIF | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9958379 (ZHU JIAJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 25 - column 24, line 39 ** figures 1-8 *; | [XI]US2018143322 (ROSENZWEIG OREN [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,13-15 * paragraphs [0182] - [0198] - [0358] - [0383] * * figures 5, 22 * [I] 4,7-12; | [A]GB2562037 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * pages 1-17 * * figures 1-10 * |