EP3701876 - ACOUSTIC SENSING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIWALE, Sujitkumar Sureshrao c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BERA, Deep c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
DE WILD, Nico Maris Adriaan c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
CHAKRABARTI, Biswaroop c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
GIJSBERS, Gerardus Henricus Maria c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Ganesan c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
JOHNSON, Mark Thomas c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19159797.0 | 27.02.2019 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701876 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B7/02, A61B5/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61B8/085 (EP);
A61B5/684 (US);
A61B5/6833 (US);
A61B7/003 (EP,US);
A61B8/0883 (EP,US);
A61B8/4488 (US);
A61B8/5269 (EP);
A61B8/54 (US);
A61B2562/0204 (US);
A61B2562/046 (US);
A61B5/4504 (EP);
A61B5/4887 (EP,US);
A61B5/6801 (EP);
A61B7/026 (EP,US);
A61B8/0875 (EP);
A61B8/4236 (EP);
A61B8/4444 (EP);
A61B8/4477 (EP);
A61B8/4494 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKUSTISCHEN ERFASSUNG | [2020/36] | English: | ACOUSTIC SENSING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2020/36] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ACOUSTIQUE | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6193668 (CHASSAING CHARLES E [US], et al); | [I]US2012059280 (HORII NORIAKI [JP]); | [A]US2013158435 (ENDO MITSURU [JP], et al); |