EP3530597 - MULTICHANNEL FEEDING SYSTEM FOR PAPER ROLLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHAN LI Machinery Co., Ltd No. 17 Dinghu Guishan District Taoyuan City 33378 / TW | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAI, Tu-Chung Chan Li Machinery Co Ltd No.17, Dinghu, Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City 33378 / TW | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Baldwin, Mark Firebird IP 27 Old Gloucester Street London WC1N 3AX / GB | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 19159845.7 | 27.02.2019 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | TW20180106579 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: TW 107106579 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530597 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/51, B65G47/57, B65G47/61 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B65G47/5122 (EP,US);
B65G15/08 (US);
B65G15/40 (US);
B65G47/57 (EP,US);
B65G47/61 (EP,US);
B65H3/04 (US);
B65H5/021 (US);
B26D3/16 (EP,US);
B26D7/0683 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0232 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKANALIGES ZUFÜHRSYSTEM FÜR PAPIERROLLEN | [2019/35] | English: | MULTICHANNEL FEEDING SYSTEM FOR PAPER ROLLS | [2019/35] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION MULTICANAUX POUR ROULEAUX DE PAPIER | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 23.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 02.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004231959 (BETTI GIULIO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012163944 (MICHLER JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014151192 (CICALINI GIANCARLO [IT], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |