EP3537357 - PROGRAM FOR SUPPORTING SIMULATION, METHOD FOR SUPPORTING SIMULATION, AND SIMULATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Xin c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Koda, Shiho c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Yuki, Hiroko c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Tatsuma, Kazuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 19159955.4 | 28.02.2019 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | JP20180039097 | 05.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018039097 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537357 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/10, G06Q20/32 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP);
G06Q20/3221 (EP);
G06Q40/02 (CN);
G06Q40/04 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGRAMM ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON SIMULATION, VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON SIMULATION UND SIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/37] | English: | PROGRAM FOR SUPPORTING SIMULATION, METHOD FOR SUPPORTING SIMULATION, AND SIMULATION DEVICE | [2019/37] | French: | PROGRAMME DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE SIMULATION, PROCÉDÉ DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE SIMULATION ET DISPOSITIF DE SIMULATION | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 15.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/10] | 02.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.05.2022 | 20.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018005229 (GRASSADONIA BRIAN [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0131] *; | [I]US2017004577 (CUNNINGHAM ANTHONY [AU]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,6-11 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0115] * | by applicant | JP2004078293 | JP2004139346 | JP2014225253 |