EP3543163 - CONTAINER FOR A ROTARY CLOSURE WITH TAMPER INDICATING BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GFV Verschlusstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Reutiner Str. 14 72275 Alpirsbach / DE | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saier, Hanns-Ulrich Reutiner Str. 7 72275 Alpirsbach / DE | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 19160115.2 | 28.02.2019 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | DE201810106844 | 22.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018106844 | [2019/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543163 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543163 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B65D41/3404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR EINEN DREHVERSCHLUSS MIT ORIGINALITÄTSRING | [2019/39] | English: | CONTAINER FOR A ROTARY CLOSURE WITH TAMPER INDICATING BAND | [2019/39] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR UNE FERMETURE ROTATIVE À BAGUE D'INVIOLABILITÉ | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 17.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2019 | AL | 09.12.2020 | CY | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2020 | DK | 09.12.2020 | EE | 09.12.2020 | ES | 09.12.2020 | FI | 09.12.2020 | HR | 09.12.2020 | IT | 09.12.2020 | LT | 09.12.2020 | LV | 09.12.2020 | MC | 09.12.2020 | MK | 09.12.2020 | MT | 09.12.2020 | PL | 09.12.2020 | RO | 09.12.2020 | RS | 09.12.2020 | SE | 09.12.2020 | SI | 09.12.2020 | SK | 09.12.2020 | SM | 09.12.2020 | IE | 28.02.2021 | LU | 28.02.2021 | BG | 09.03.2021 | NO | 09.03.2021 | GR | 10.03.2021 | IS | 09.04.2021 | PT | 09.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 28.02.2019 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
MK | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.02.2019 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0433193 (CEBAL [FR]) [X] 1,5-12 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 36; figures 1-3, 5, 6; claim 8 *; | [A]WO9742092 (NEOPAC AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,3,4* figures 1, 4 *; | [X]EP2256053 (INVAT SRL [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1, 2 * |