EP3705440 - A METHOD FOR TESTING AN ELEVATOR MACHINERY BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/37] | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELEVATOR | ||
[2023/32] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calcagno, Alessio KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Stolt, Lauri KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Kangas, Petteri KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
Jokinen, Risto KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 19160536.9 | 04.03.2019 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705440 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705440 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B66B5/0025 (EP);
B66B5/02 (CN);
B66B1/32 (US);
B66B5/0031 (CN,US);
B66B5/0037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINER AUFZUGSMACHINEBREMSE | [2023/32] | English: | A METHOD FOR TESTING AN ELEVATOR MACHINERY BRAKE | [2023/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TEST D'UN FREIN DE MACHINE D'ASCENSEUR | [2023/34] |
Former [2020/37] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES AUFZUGS | ||
Former [2020/37] | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELEVATOR | ||
Former [2020/37] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN ASCENSEUR | Examination procedure | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 20.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4987977 (NOMURA MASAMI [JP]) [X] 1-3,7 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 13; figure 1 *; | [X]JP2008168981 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0007] *; | [XAI]EP2537790 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,8,14,15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0064] * * figures 1, 5 * [A] 9-13 [I] 7; | [I]EP3138801 (KONE CORP [FI]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1-3 ** paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0020] * | Examination | WO2010061050 |