EP3536870 - PANEL FOR CURTAIN FAÇADE, CURTAIN FAÇADE COMPRISING SUCH A PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO EXTRUDED SOLUTIONS AS Drammensveien 264 0283 Oslo / NO | [2021/02] |
Former [2019/37] | For all designated states Hydro Extruded Solutions AS 11. Etg Biskop Gunnerus' gate 14A 0185 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASFARGUES, Francis 16 Avenue Louis Couder 31670 Labège / FR | 02 /
CLAUZET, Robert 1 Rue du 14 Juillet 1789 31120 Roquettes / FR | 03 /
JEFFROY, Maxime 33 Avenue Tolosane Appartement 2102 Bâtiment 2 31520 Ramonville St Agne / FR | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/37] | 01 /
LASFARGUES, Francis 16 Avenue Louis Couder 31670 Labège / FR | ||
02 /
CLAUZET, Robert 1 Rue du 14 Juillet 1789 31120 Roquettes / FR | |||
03 /
JEFFROY, Maxime 11 Impasse André Marfaing Appartement 111 31400 Toulouse / FR | Representative(s) | Ipside 6, Impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 19160870.2 | 05.03.2019 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | FR20180051906 | 06.03.2018 Original published format: FR 1851906 | [2019/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536870 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3536870 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/90, // E04B2/96 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
E04B2/90 (EP);
E06B1/366 (EP);
E06B3/308 (EP);
E04B2/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PANEEL FÜR VORHANGFASSADE, UND VORHANGFASSADE, DIE EIN SOLCHES PANEEL UMFASST | [2019/37] | English: | PANEL FOR CURTAIN FAÇADE, CURTAIN FAÇADE COMPRISING SUCH A PANEL | [2019/37] | French: | PANNEAU POUR FAÇADE RIDEAU, FAÇADE RIDEAU COMPORTANT UN TEL PANNEAU | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 06.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2020 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2019 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | IT | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | MK | 20.01.2021 | MT | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | TR | 20.01.2021 | IE | 05.03.2021 | LU | 05.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.03.2019 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
TR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 05.03.2019 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 05.03.2019 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
LU | 05.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3852915 (SCHACHT L) [X] 1,14 * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 20; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-13 [I] 15; | [A]US4229905 (RUSH JEROME B) [A] 1* column 2, line 31 - column 5, line 44; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5412922 (VITTORI BERNARDO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 26; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2015284950 (STRAMANDINOLI GIOVANNI [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |