EP3708426 - LOAD SECURING BAR AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/38] | LOAD SECURING BAR | ||
[2023/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fliegl, Helmut Oberpöllnitzer Straße 8 07819 Triptis / DE | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 19161811.5 | 11.03.2019 | [2020/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708426 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708426 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/15, B60P1/64, B60P7/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
B60P7/15 (EP);
B60P1/649 (EP);
B60P7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LADUNGSSICHERUNGSBALKEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2023/04] | English: | LOAD SECURING BAR AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2023/04] | French: | BARRE DE SÉCURISATION DE CHARGE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2023/04] |
Former [2020/38] | LADUNGSSICHERUNGSBALKEN | ||
Former [2020/38] | LOAD SECURING BAR | ||
Former [2020/38] | BARRE DE SÉCURISATION DE CHARGE | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 16.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | IT | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]EP1291239 (FAHRZEUGWERK BERNARD KRONE [DE]) [XD] 11 * figure - * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * [A] 12,13; | [XA]DE102013101363 (ALLSAFE JUNGFALK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,5,9,14 * figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * [A] 2-4,6-8,10-13,15; | [A]EP3098113 (MG DIENSTVERLENING EN TRANSP [NL]) [A] 11-13* the whole document *; | [A]EP3184361 (SCHMITZ CARGOBULL AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | US3130690 | by applicant | US5954465 | EP1291239 | EP2687404 |