EP3560591 - MICROFLUIDIC SORTING USING HIGH GRADIENT MAGNETIC FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPUHLER, Philipp S. 333 Main St, Apt 227 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Kyle C. 376 Washington Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
FACHIN, Fabio 356 Pearl Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
BARBER, Thomas Alan 30 Adamson Street, Unit B Allston, MA 02134 / US | 05 /
KAPUR, Ravi 2 Chase Drive Sharon, MA 02067 / US | 06 /
TONER, Mehmet 36 Ninth Street Charlestown, MA 02129 / US | 07 /
PAI, Vincent 99 Cedar Street Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 08 /
KARABACAK, Murat N. 4 Canal Park, Apt. 204 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/07] |
Former [2019/44] | Ammelburg, Jan Moritz c/o Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19161862.8 | 20.10.2014 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | US201361892947P | 18.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361892947 P | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560591 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560591 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B03C1/01, B03C1/28, B03C1/033, G01N35/00, // G01N35/10, G01N15/14, G01N15/10, C12M3/06, C12M1/42, C12M1/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
G01N35/0098 (EP,US);
C12M47/04 (EP,US);
B01L3/00 (EP,US);
B01L3/502753 (EP,US);
B01L3/502761 (EP,US);
B03C1/01 (EP,US);
B03C1/0332 (EP,US);
B03C1/0335 (EP);
B03C1/288 (EP,US);
C12M23/16 (EP,US);
G01N1/00 (US);
G01N15/1433 (EP,US);
G01N15/1484 (EP);
B01L2200/0652 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2400/043 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L2400/086 (EP,US);
B03C2201/18 (EP,US);
B03C2201/22 (EP,US);
B03C2201/26 (EP,US);
C12M35/06 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | B01L3/00, B03C1/01, B03C1/28, B03C1/033, G01N35/00, // G01N35/10, G01N15/14, G01N15/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE SORTIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MAGNETFELDERN MIT HOHEM GRADIENTEN | [2019/44] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC SORTING USING HIGH GRADIENT MAGNETIC FIELDS | [2019/44] | French: | TRI MICROFLUIDIQUE FAISANT INTERVENIR DES CHAMPS MAGNÉTIQUES À GRADIENT ÉLEVÉ | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14853592.5 / EP3058316 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2014 | AL | 17.02.2021 | AT | 17.02.2021 | CY | 17.02.2021 | CZ | 17.02.2021 | DK | 17.02.2021 | EE | 17.02.2021 | ES | 17.02.2021 | FI | 17.02.2021 | HR | 17.02.2021 | IT | 17.02.2021 | LT | 17.02.2021 | LV | 17.02.2021 | MC | 17.02.2021 | MK | 17.02.2021 | NL | 17.02.2021 | PL | 17.02.2021 | RO | 17.02.2021 | RS | 17.02.2021 | SE | 17.02.2021 | SI | 17.02.2021 | SK | 17.02.2021 | SM | 17.02.2021 | TR | 17.02.2021 | BG | 17.05.2021 | NO | 17.05.2021 | GR | 18.05.2021 | IS | 17.06.2021 | PT | 17.06.2021 | IE | 20.10.2021 | LU | 20.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 20.10.2014 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
MK | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.10.2014 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5795470 (WANG YUZHOU [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 1 lines 18-32; col. 3 lines 19-33; col. 3 line 44 - col. 4 line 17; col. 4 lines 44-50; col. 5 lines 1-54; col. 10 lines 40-47 and 54-65; col. 15 line 50 - col. 16 line 13; col. 16 lines 42-65; col. 18 line 52 - col. 19 line 12;; figures 2, 13-15; claim 1 *; | [A]US2012135494 (MURTHY SUNIL SRINIVASA [IN], et al) [A] 1,8* paragraphs [0001] , [0050] , [0064] - [0068]; figures 1, 7; claims 1-5, 13, 14 *; | [XP]WO2014004577 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [XP] 1,2,8,9 * page 1 lines 2, 3 and 13-15; page 13 lines 23-28; page 26 lines 7-12 and 23-26; page 31 line 27 - page 33 line 21; page 46 lines 7-28;; figures 1A, 8H, 11, 12A, 12B, 21C; claims 27, 52 *; | [A] - E. OZKUMUR ET AL, "Inertial Focusing for Tumor Antigen-Dependent and -Independent Sorting of Rare Circulating Tumor Cells", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, (20130403), vol. 5, no. 179, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3005616, ISSN 1946-6234, pages 179ra47 - 179ra47, XP055089547 [A] 1-15 * abstract; section "RESULTS - CTC-iChip design and function";; figures 1A, 1D, 2A, 2B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3005616 | [A] - E. OZKUMUR ET AL, "Supplementary Materials for Inertial Focusing for Tumor Antigen-Dependent and -Independent Sorting of Rare Circulating Tumor Cells", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, US, (20130403), vol. 5, no. 179, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3005616, ISSN 1946-6234, pages 179ra47 - 179ra47, XP055624651 [A] 1-15 * figures S4(A), S5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3005616 | by applicant | US5968820 | WO0061191 | US6540896 | US2003092029 | US2003124194 | US6767706 | US2006134599 | US2006269965 | US2011091987 | US8021614 | US8186913 |