EP3514081 - PACK OF SMOKING ARTICLES AND ASSOCIATED METHOD OF PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International S.A. 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERONACE, Patrick Conduit Road 41C Apartment 1A/1F Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
MEWHA, Paul A. Zum Waldeskuehl 10 54298 Igel / DE | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/30] | 01 /
PERONACE, Patrick Nikolaus-Mommer-Strasse 72 54296 Trier / DE | ||
02 /
MEWHA, Paul A. Zum Waldeskuehl 10 54298 Igel / DE | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19161993.1 | 11.11.2013 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | EP20120193628 | 21.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12193628 | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514081 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B65D85/1018 (EP,IL);
B65D85/10 (IL,RU);
B65D85/00 (IL);
B65D85/1081 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Title | German: | PACK AUS RAUCHARTIKELN, ROHLING DAFÜR UND ZUGEHÖRIGES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2019/30] | English: | PACK OF SMOKING ARTICLES AND ASSOCIATED METHOD OF PACKAGING | [2019/30] | French: | PAQUET D'ARTICLES À FUMER, ÉBAUCHE ASSOCIÉE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉS | [2019/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13791969.2 / EP2922771 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9849072 (ROTHMANS BENSON & HEDGES [CA], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [I] 2-8,10-12; | [A]US6237760 (PARKER MICHAEL PATRICK [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 65 * * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 57 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 8 *; | [A]WO0230790 (MOLINS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** page 3, paragraph l - page 5, line 1 *; | [A]DE102009034705 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figure 8 * |