EP3709201 - METHOD FOR VERIFYING AN EXECUTION ENVIRONMENT USED FOR EXECUTION OF AT LEAST ONE HARDWARE-APPLICATION PROVIDED BY A CONFIGURABLE HARDWARE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aschauer, Hans Caroline-Herschel-Str. 23 81829 München / DE | 02 /
Falk, Rainer Primelweg 9 85586 Poing / DE | 03 /
Feist, Christian Peter Willibaldstr. 136 80689 München / DE | 04 /
Fries, Steffen Eberweg 3 85598 Baldham / DE | 05 /
Maftun, Aliza Hochäckerstraße 21 81549 München / DE | 06 /
Seuschek, Hermann Kössener Straße 6b 81373 München / DE | 07 /
Zeschg, Thomas Winterstraße 5 81543 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 19162488.1 | 13.03.2019 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709201 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, G06F21/76 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
G06F21/572 (EP);
G06F21/575 (EP);
G06F21/76 (EP,US);
G06F2221/034 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG EINER AUSFÜHRUNGSUMGEBUNG, DIE FÜR DIE AUSFÜHRUNG MINDESTENS EINER HARDWARE-ANWENDUNG VERWENDET WIRD, DIE VON EINEM KONFIGURIERBAREN HARDWARE-MODUL BEREITGESTELLT WIRD | [2020/38] | English: | METHOD FOR VERIFYING AN EXECUTION ENVIRONMENT USED FOR EXECUTION OF AT LEAST ONE HARDWARE-APPLICATION PROVIDED BY A CONFIGURABLE HARDWARE MODULE | [2020/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE VÉRIFICATION D'UN ENVIRONNEMENT D'EXÉCUTION UTILISÉ POUR L'EXÉCUTION D'AU MOINS UNE APPLICATION MATÉRIELLE FOURNIE PAR UN MODULE MATÉRIEL CONFIGURABLE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/34] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015188707 (GEHRER STEFAN [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] , [0058] - [0061] *; | [Y]WO2017161305 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0122] - [0123] *; | [Y]CN109039591 (CHIPEYE MICROELECTRONICS FOSHAN LTD) [Y] 1-15* abstract * |