EP3540019 - RECORDING METHOD, INK SET, AND RECORDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA, Ippei c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 19163292.6 | 15.03.2019 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | JP20180049354 | 16.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018049354 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540019 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/102, C09D11/106, C09D11/107, C09D11/322, C09D11/38, C09D11/40, C09D11/54 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
C09D11/54 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (CN);
B41J2/21 (CN);
B41J2/2114 (US);
B41M5/0017 (EP,US);
B41M7/0054 (EP,US);
C09D11/102 (EP,US);
C09D11/106 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (CN);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/36 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN, TINTENSATZ UND AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/38] | English: | RECORDING METHOD, INK SET, AND RECORDING APPARATUS | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT, JEU D'ENCRE ET APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 18.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004107427 (CANON KK) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * paragraph [0109]; claim 1 ** paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0118] *; | [X]US2005062819 (OHYA HIDENOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0122]; claim 1; table 1 *; | [X]EP1759858 (KONICA MINOLTA PHOTO IMAGING [JP]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0225] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0207]; tables 1,2 *; | [X]US2011001775 (NISHIWAKI YUKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * claim 1; tables 4,5,8 *; | [X]US8873103 (TSUCHIYA OKINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * column 16 - column 18; figures 17-20; claim 1; table 1 *; | [XY]JP2015209535 (CANON KK) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046]; table 1 * * paragraph [0051]; table 3 * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]EP3061618 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * claim 1; tables 5,6 * | by applicant | JPS621426B | JPH0356573 | JPH0379678 | JPH03160068 | JPH0418462 | JPH07258578 | JPH083498 | JPH08283596 | JPH10110110 | JPH10110111 | JPH10110114 | JPH10120958 | JPH10195331 | JPH10195360 | JPH10237349 | JPH10330665 | JP2017110182 |