EP3549815 - METHOD FOR ARRANGING A RESERVATION FOR A BATTERY, METHOD FOR ARRANGING A RESERVATION FOR A RECHARGE PORT, POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR MANAGING BATTERIES, AND POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR MANAGING RECHARGE PORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kwang Yang Motor Co., Ltd. No. 35, Wan Hsing Street San Min District Kaohsiung City 80794 / TW | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TU, Chia-Cheng No. 35, Wan Hsing Street Sanmin District 80794 Kaohsiung / TW | 02 /
TIEN, Chi-Wei No. 35, Wan Hsing Street Sanmin District 80794 Kaohsiung / TW | 03 /
CHEN, Chien-Hung No. 35, Wan Hsing Street Sanmin District 80794 Kaohsiung / TW | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 19163467.4 | 18.03.2019 | [2019/41] | Priority number, date | TW20180109341 | 19.03.2018 Original published format: TW 107109341 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549815 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/65, B60L53/66, B60L53/67, B60L58/12 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L53/66 (EP);
B60L53/67 (EP);
B60L58/12 (EP);
B60L2240/62 (EP);
B60L2240/72 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP);
Y02T90/167 (EP);
Y04S30/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANORDNUNG EINER RESERVIERUNG FÜR EINE BATTERIE, VERFAHREN ZUR ANORDNUNG EINER RESERVIERUNG FÜR EINEN LADEANSCHLUSS, LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON BATTERIEN UND LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON LADEANSCHLÜSSEN | [2019/41] | English: | METHOD FOR ARRANGING A RESERVATION FOR A BATTERY, METHOD FOR ARRANGING A RESERVATION FOR A RECHARGE PORT, POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR MANAGING BATTERIES, AND POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR MANAGING RECHARGE PORTS | [2019/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AGENCEMENT D'UNE RÉSERVATION POUR UNE BATTERIE, PROCÉDÉ D'AGENCEMENT D'UNE RÉSERVATION POUR UN PORT DE RECHARGE, SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE POUR GÉRER DES BATTERIES ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE POUR GÉRER DES PORTS DE RECHARGE | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 09.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010094496 (HERSHKOVITZ BARAK [IL], et al) [A] 11,17,19 * abstract * * paragraph [0121] ** paragraph [0124] *; | [A]US2013342310 (PARK JUN-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [A]US2015198459 (MACNEILLE PERRY ROBINSON [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]US2017276503 (OH JAE CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0032] *; | [I]CN107770268 (YANG HUAILIANG) [I] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0059] * |