EP3543659 - MASS AIR FLOW SENSOR WITH ABSOLUTE PRESSURE COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORENSON, Richard C. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
GILLES, Derek 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
HOOVER, William 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 04 /
SPELDRICH, Jamie 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 05 /
BENTLEY, Ian 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2021/46] |
Former [2019/39] | 01 /
SORENSON, Richard C. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | ||
02 /
GILLES, Derek 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
03 /
HOOVER, William 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
04 /
SPELDRICH, Jamie 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
05 /
BENTLEY, Ian 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19163577.0 | 18.03.2019 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | US201815926647 | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US201815926647 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543659 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/68, G01F15/02, G01L19/00 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
G01F1/68 (EP,US);
G01F15/022 (US);
G01F1/6845 (US);
G01F1/69 (US);
G01F1/6986 (US);
G01F1/86 (CN,US);
G01F15/02 (EP,US);
G01F15/04 (CN);
G01F15/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTMASSENMESSER MIT ABSOLUTDRUCKAUSGLEICH | [2019/39] | English: | MASS AIR FLOW SENSOR WITH ABSOLUTE PRESSURE COMPENSATION | [2019/39] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DÉBIT MASSIQUE D'AIR À COMPENSATION DE PRESSION ABSOLUE | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 23.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007151366 (MCDONALD WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [XI]US2016245681 (MAGINNIS THOMAS O [US], et al); | [X]EP3076262 (SENSATA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | by applicant | US7647842 | US8418549 | US8695417 |