EP3524208 - OPHTHALMIC LUBRICATION SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon Inc. Rue Louis-d'Affry 6 1701 Fribourg / CH | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURNE, John Morgan c/o ALCON RESEARCH LTD. 6201 South Freeway Fort Worth, TX 76134 / US | 02 /
SUSSMAN, Glenn Robert 28602 Rancho Grande Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19164012.7 | 20.10.2014 | [2019/33] | Priority number, date | US201361899973P | 05.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361899973 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524208 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16, A61F9/007, F04B43/08, F04B43/12 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
A61F9/00736 (EP,KR,RU,US);
F04B43/086 (RU,US);
A61F2/16 (MX);
A61F9/00745 (KR);
A61B2017/320084 (KR);
Y10T29/4924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2019/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHES SCHMIERSYSTEM UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/33] | English: | OPHTHALMIC LUBRICATION SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS | [2019/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LUBRIFICATION OPHTALMIQUE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2019/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14860983.7 / EP3033046 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006348900 (JAPAN SERVO); | [A]EP1847711 (BREDEL HOSE PUMPS B V [NL]); | [X]JP2009257179 (KAWAGUCHI ELECTRIC WORKS); | [XP]US2014271251 (BOURNE JOHN MORGAN [US], et al) |