EP3711874 - DEVICE WITH A HOUSING AND A ROTATING MEMBER ROTATABLE IN THE HOUSING AND AXIALLY SLIDABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grabner, Walter Sportallee 8 4501 Neuhofen an der Krems / AT | 02 /
Moser, Friedrich Pelmberg 45 4202 Hellmonsoedt / AT | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 19164296.6 | 21.03.2019 | [2020/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3711874 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B21B39/14 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
B21B39/14 (EP,KR,US);
B21B15/0007 (KR);
B21B15/00 (CN,US);
B21C47/3433 (CN,KR);
B21B2015/0028 (KR);
B21B2015/0057 (CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM GEHÄUSE UND EINEM IN DEM GEHÄUSE DREHBAR UND AXIAL VERSCHIEBBAR GELAGERTEN DREHELEMENT | [2020/39] | English: | DEVICE WITH A HOUSING AND A ROTATING MEMBER ROTATABLE IN THE HOUSING AND AXIALLY SLIDABLE | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DOTÉ D'UN BOÎTIER ET D'UN ÉLÉMENT ROTATIF LOGÉ ROTATIF ET COULISSANT DANS LEDIT BOÎTIER | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6234910U ; | [A]EP2853315 (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH GMBH [AT]); | by applicant | EP3049198 |