EP3716442 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRICAL ENERGY SUPPLY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirkman, Robert Hopfengartenweg 10 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19164887.2 | 25.03.2019 | [2020/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716442 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00, G06F17/00, G06F9/00, G06F12/00, H02J3/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
G06F9/5077 (EP);
G06F12/0284 (EP);
G06F9/54 (EP);
H02J13/00006 (EP);
H02J3/00 (EP);
G06F2212/1032 (EP);
G06F2212/154 (EP);
G06F2212/163 (EP);
H02J2203/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSNETZES | [2020/40] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRICAL ENERGY SUPPLY NETWORK | [2020/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN RÉSEAU D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 29.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6058460 (NAKHIMOVSKY GREGORY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 22; figures 1-4 ** column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 22 *; | [Y]US2013110294 (POCHAYEVETS OLEKSANDR [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 35] - [0042]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP3107174 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0063]; figure 4 *; | [XYI]US2017212492 (HEYDE CHRIS OLIVER [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,11,12 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0075]; figure 1 * [Y] 4,6-11,13-15 [I] 2,3 | by applicant | WO2004030174 |