EP3546238 - SECURITY ELEMENT WITH A METALLIZED STRUCTURED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Ta-Hua c/o 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center St. Paul, MN 55144-1000 / US | 02 /
Dunn, Douglas Scott c/o 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center St. Paul, MN 55144-1000 / US | 03 /
Kolb, William Blake c/o 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center St. Paul, MN 55144-1000 / US | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Maximilianstraße 35 Eingang A 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19164937.5 | 25.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | US201862648555P | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648555 P | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3546238 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3546238 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/324, B42D25/373, B42D25/328, B42D25/351 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,CN,US);
B42D25/351 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (EP,CN,US);
B42D25/47 (CN);
G09F3/02 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | B42D25/324, B42D25/373 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT MIT EINER METALLISIERTEN STRUKTURIERTEN OBERFLÄCHE | [2019/40] | English: | SECURITY ELEMENT WITH A METALLIZED STRUCTURED SURFACE | [2019/40] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ AVEC UNE SURFACE STRUCTURÉE MÉTALLISÉE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 08.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9740464 (ADVANCED DEPOSITION TECHNOLOGI [US]) [I] 1-20* pages 3-5; figure 2 *; | [I]WO03053713 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 15, line 4 - line 26; figure 8 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 6 * * page 18, line 7 - line 18 * |