EP3525531 - MULTI SIM MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/33] | MULTL SIM MANAGEMENT | ||
[2024/24] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - English title | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/24] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSSO, Nicolas 17 rue Rosella 72240 La Chapelle Saint Fray / FR | 02 /
PRETESEILLE, Erwan 152, Chem Bordages 72230 ARNAGE / FR | 03 /
ROULLIER, Sylviane 28 Rue du Colonel Coutelle 72000 LE MANS / FR | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2019/33] | Application number, filing date | 19165012.6 | 30.12.2010 | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525531 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3525531 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/06, H04W68/00, // H04W8/20 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | H04W68/00, H04W88/06, // H04W8/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRFACH-SIM-VERWALTUNG | [2019/33] | English: | MULTI SIM MANAGEMENT | [2024/24] | French: | GESTION À PLUSIEURS SIM | [2019/33] |
Former [2019/33] | MULTL SIM MANAGEMENT | Examination procedure | 12.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 12.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10306538.9 / EP2472973 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003125073 (TSAI HSIEN-MING [TW], et al); | [A]US2003181216 (TSAI HSIEN-MING [TW], et al); | [XI]US2009131054 (ZHANG XUEJUN [CN]); | [XI]US2009156257 (SHI FENG [CN]) | by applicant | CN101217747 | US2009013054 |