EP3545887 - METHOD FOR SMOKE EVACUATION FOR SURGICAL HUB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park Guaynabo 00969 / PR | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YATES, David C. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
DANZIGER, Benjamin J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 03 /
SHELTON, Frederick E., IV 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 04 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 05 /
ALRDIDGE, Jeffrey L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2023/51] |
Former [2019/40] | 01 /
YATES, David C. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | ||
02 /
DANZIGER, Benjamin J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | |||
03 /
SHELTON, Frederick E., IV 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | |||
04 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | |||
05 /
ALRDIDGE, Jeffrey L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Bettridge, Paul Sebastian Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19165944.0 | 28.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | US201862649291P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649291 P | US201862649294P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649294 P | US201862649296P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649296 P | US201862649300P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649300 P | US201862649302P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649302 P | US201862649307P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649307 P | US201862649309P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649309 P | US201862649310P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649310 P | US201862649313P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649313 P | US201862649315P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649315 P | US201862649320P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649320 P | US201862649323P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649323 P | US201862649327P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649327 P | US201862649333P | 28.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649333 P | US201862650877P | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650877 P | US201862650882P | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650882 P | US201862650887P | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650887 P | US201862650898P | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650898 P | US201862659900P | 19.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862659900 P | US201862665128P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665128 P | US201862665129P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665129 P | US201862665134P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665134 P | US201862665139P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665139 P | US201862665177P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665177 P | US201862665192P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665192 P | US201862691219P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691219 P | US201862691227P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691227 P | US201862691228P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691228 P | US201862691230P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691230 P | US201862691251P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691251 P | US201862691257P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691257 P | US201862691262P | 28.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862691262 P | US201862692747P | 30.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862692747 P | US201862692748P | 30.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862692748 P | US201862692768P | 30.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862692768 P | US201862721995P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862721995 P | US201862721996P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862721996 P | US201862721999P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862721999 P | US201862721994P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862721994 P | US201862721998P | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862721998 P | US201862729176P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729176 P | US201862729177P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729177 P | US201862729182P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729182 P | US201862729183P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729183 P | US201862729184P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729184 P | US201862729185P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729185 P | US201862729186P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729186 P | US201862729191P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729191 P | US201862729195P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729195 P | US201862750529P | 25.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750529 P | US201862750539P | 25.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750539 P | US201862750555P | 25.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750555 P | US201862773741P | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862773741 P | US201862773742P | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862773742 P | US201862773778P | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862773778 P | US201816209447 | 04.12.2018 Original published format: US201816209447 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545887 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61M1/00, A61B18/14, B01D46/00, A61B34/37, A61B34/35, // A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/1477 (EP);
A61B34/35 (EP);
A61B34/37 (EP);
A61M1/60 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP);
A61B2017/00199 (EP);
A61B2017/00221 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP);
A61B2017/32007 (EP);
A61B2018/00589 (EP);
A61B2018/00595 (EP);
A61B2018/00601 (EP);
A61B2018/00607 (EP);
A61B2018/0063 (EP);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00702 (EP);
A61B2018/00744 (EP);
A61B2018/00791 (EP);
A61B2018/1253 (EP);
A61B2018/126 (EP);
A61B2034/302 (EP);
A61B2090/0818 (EP);
A61B2217/005 (EP);
A61B2217/007 (EP);
A61B2218/002 (EP);
A61B2218/006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RAUCHABFÜHRUNG FÜR EINEN CHIRURGISCHEN HUB | [2019/40] | English: | METHOD FOR SMOKE EVACUATION FOR SURGICAL HUB | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE D'ÉVACUATION DE LA FUMÉE POUR CENTRE CHIRURGICAL | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 02.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5342349 (KAUFMAN DAVID W [US]) [A] 1,8,15 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2010036373 (WARD ARLEN K [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036]; figure 5 *; | [Y]US2014128885 (DACHS II GREGORY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0037] , [0038] , [0044] , [0054]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102016207666 (WINTER & IBE OLYMPUS [DE]) [A] 3,5,11,13,17,19 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] *; | [E]EP3505121 (ETHICON LLC [PR]) [E] 1-20* paragraphs [0039] , [0041] , [0044] - [0046] - [0190] - [0191] - [0198] - [0199]; figures 3-7,24 * | by applicant | US6214000 | US6582424 | US7982776 | US7995045 | US2011306840 | US2014243597 | US2014263552 | US9060775 | US9345481 | US2017086914 | US2017296213 | US19390627505 | US19550627505 | US19830627291 | US19770627291 | US19760627291 | US19850627291 | US19840627291 | US19820627291 | US19910627291 | US19950627291 | US19860627291 | US19950627219 | US19980627219 | US19990627219 | US19940627219 | US19960627219 | US19470626927 | US19480626927 | US19680626927 | US20190626912 | US19570626912 | US19620626912 | US19510626912 | US19390626651 | US19770626651 | US19920626651 | US19340626651 | US20000626599 | US19980626508 | US19870626508 | US19820626508 | US19770626508 | US20020626493 | US19940626492 | US20000626493 | US20090626493 | US20100626493 | US19910626492 | US19960626492 | US19330626493 | US20150626493 | US20130626493 | US20200626493 | US20070626493 | US20230626493 | US19410626113 | US19400626113 | US19390626113 | US20170626404 | US20150626404 |