EP3716321 - COMPONENT CARRIER WITH EMBEDDED SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT AND EMBEDDED HIGHLY CONDUCTIVE BLOCK WHICH ARE MUTUALLY COUPLED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT & S Austria Technologie & Systemtechnik Aktiengesellschaft Fabriksgasse 13 8700 Leoben-Hinterberg / AT | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stahr, Johannes Weinbergsiedlung 4 8605 St. Lorenzen im Mürztal / AT | 02 /
Zluc, Andreas Im Tal 101 8700 Leoben / AT | 03 /
Morianz, Mike Franz-Werfel-Gasse 30 8045 Graz / AT | 04 /
Moitzi, Heinz Bundesstr. 26 8740 Zeltweg / AT | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 19166119.8 | 29.03.2019 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716321 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/367, H05K1/02, H05K1/18, H01L23/538, // H01L23/427, H01L23/473, H05K3/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
H01L23/3677 (EP);
H05K1/0204 (CN);
H01L23/3675 (US);
H01L23/473 (EP);
H01L23/49822 (US);
H01L23/5389 (EP);
H05K1/0209 (CN);
H05K1/0272 (US);
H05K3/4644 (US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP);
H01L2224/18 (EP);
H01L2224/2518 (EP);
H01L2224/32245 (EP);
H01L2224/73267 (EP);
H01L2224/8384 (EP);
H01L23/427 (EP);
H01L24/19 (EP);
H05K2201/06 (CN);
H05K2201/10166 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/8384, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUELEMENTTRÄGER MIT EINGEBETTETEM HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND EINGEBETTETEM HOCHLEITFÄHIGEM BLOCK, DIE MITEINANDER GEKOPPELT SIND | [2020/40] | English: | COMPONENT CARRIER WITH EMBEDDED SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT AND EMBEDDED HIGHLY CONDUCTIVE BLOCK WHICH ARE MUTUALLY COUPLED | [2020/40] | French: | SUPPORT DE COMPOSANT À SEMICONDUCTEUR INTÉGRÉ ET BLOC HAUTEMENT CONDUCTEUR INTÉGRÉ QUI SONT MUTUELLEMENT COUPLÉS | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 25.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010295170 (KOMURA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [XI]EP2854168 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [XYI]US2015102499 (COULLOMB ALEXANDRE [FR]); | [XYI]US9107290 (CHEN DA-JUNG [SG]); | [XI]US2017287808 (BRAUNISCH HENNING [US], et al); | [Y]US2018063965 (LEITGEB MARKUS [AT], et al); | [XI]US2018233429 (YOSUI KUNIAKI [JP], et al); | [XI]US10141182 (MOLLA JAYNAL A [US], et al); | [XI]US2019057924 (KIM TAE HYUN [KR], et al) |