EP3544065 - BOND AND RELEASE LAYER TRANSFER PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qmat, Inc. 2424 Walsh Avenue Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states Qmat, Inc. 2424 Walsh Ave. Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENLEY, Francois J. 19101 Via Tesoro Ct Saratoga, CA California 95070 / US | 02 /
KANG, Sien 5080 Persimmon Dr. Dublin, CA California 94568 / US | 03 /
ZHONG, Mingyu 2175 Decoto Rd Apt 92 Union City, CA California 94587 / US | 04 /
LI, Minghang 43230 Portofino Terrace Fremont, CA California 94539 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew John, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | White, Andrew John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19166658.5 | 17.06.2016 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | US201562181947P | 19.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562181947 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3544065 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L33/26, H01L21/04, H01L21/78, H01L21/02, // H01L21/762, C30B25/18, C30B29/40, H01L21/3105, H01L21/265, H01L29/16 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
H01L33/007 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/02 (KR);
H01L33/0093 (EP,CN,US);
C30B25/18 (EP,CN,US);
C30B29/406 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/02002 (EP,US);
H01L21/76254 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/7813 (EP,US);
H01L33/005 (KR);
H01L33/0095 (KR);
H01L33/26 (KR);
C30B25/02 (CN,US);
C30B29/403 (CN,US);
C30B33/04 (CN,US);
H01L21/0445 (CN,US);
H01L21/265 (CN,US);
H01L21/31058 (CN,US);
H01L29/1608 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR HAFT- UND TRENNSCHICHTÜBERTRAGUNG | [2019/39] | English: | BOND AND RELEASE LAYER TRANSFER PROCESS | [2019/39] | French: | PROCESSUS DE TRANSFERT DE COUCHE D'ADHÉSION ET DE LIBÉRATION | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 27.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16812584.7 / EP3311422 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003064535 (KUB FRANCIS J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 16] , [0 36] *; | [A]US2006185582 (ATWATER HARRY A JR [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]US2006255341 (PINNINGTON THOMAS H [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 2, 16, 21-23 * * paragraph [0042] *; | [X]US2009321884 (FAURE BRUCE [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 81] , [ 100] *; | [A]WO2010015878 (SOITEC SILICON ON INSULATOR [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP2157602 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]US2011057165 (PINNINGTON THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26] *; | [A]US2014183442 (ODNOBLYUDOV VLADIMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 20] *; | [X]US2014197419 (HENLEY FRANCOIS J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] , [0 48] , [0 60] * * paragraphs [0154] , [ 181] * | by applicant | US6013563 | - XUN LI et al., "Properties of GaN layers grown on N-face free-standing GaN substrates", Journal of Crystal Growth, (20150000), vol. 413, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jcrysgro.2014.11.020, pages 81 - 85, XP029188788 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrysgro.2014.11.020 | - A.R.A. ZAUNER et al., "Homo-epitaxial growth on the N-face of GaN single crystals: the influence of the misorientatlon on the surface morphology", Journal of Crystal Growth, (20020000), vol. 240, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-0248(01)02389-2, pages 14 - 21, XP004351387 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(01)02389-2 | - LIDA et al., "Laser lift-off technique for freestanding GaN substrate using an In droplet formed by thermal decomposition of GalnN and its application to light-emitting diodes", Applied Physics Letters, (20140000), vol. 105, doi:doi:10.1063/1.4893757, page 072101, XP012189331 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4893757 | - B S LI; Z G WANG, "Structures and optical properties of H2-implanted GaN epi-layers", J. Phys. D: Appl. Phys., (20150000), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1088/0022-3727/48/22/225101, XP020285090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3727/48/22/225101 | - PAUL K. CHU; CHUNG CHAN; NATHAN W. CHEUNG, "Recent Applications of Plasma Immersion Ion Implantation", SEMICONDUCTOR INTERNATIONAL, (19960600), pages 165 - 172 | - P. K. CHU; S. QIN; C. CHAN; N. W. CHEUNG; L. A. LARSON, "Plasma Immersion Ion Implantation—A Fledgling Technique for Semiconductor Processing", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING REPORTS: A REVIEW JOURNAL, (19961130), vol. R17, no. 6-7, doi:doi:10.1016/S0927-796X(96)00194-5, pages 207 - 280, XP005277393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-796X(96)00194-5 | - CHOI et al., "Densification of Radio Frequency Sputtered Silicon Oxide Films by Rapid Thermal Annealing", Journal of Applied Physics, (19980200), vol. 83, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1063/1.366974, XP012044721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.366974 | US20070784524 | US20070852088 | US20080019886 | US20080244687 | US20090935197 | US20090936582 | US20100685686 | US20100730113 | US20100789361 |