EP3570313 - MASS SPECTROMETER HAVING MULTI-DYNODE MULTIPLIER(S) OF HIGH DYNAMIC RANGE OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruker Scientific LLC 40 Manning Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNTEAN, Felician Bruker Scientific LLC., R&D 215 Holt Road Andover, Massachussetts 01810 / US | 02 /
Steiner, Urs Kyburger Straße 32 5000 Aarau / CH | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Boßmeyer, Jens Bruker Daltonics GmbH & Co. KG Fahrenheitstraße 4 28359 Bremen / DE | [2023/08] |
Former [2019/47] | Boßmeyer, Jens Bruker Daltonik GmbH Fahrenheitstraße 4 28359 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19166703.9 | 02.04.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | US201815978816 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US201815978816 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3570313 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3570313 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3570313 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/02, H01J43/02 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
H01J49/025 (EP,US);
H01J43/025 (EP);
H01J43/18 (US);
H01J49/0031 (US);
H01J49/022 (CN);
H01J49/063 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | MASSENSPEKTROMETER MIT MULTI-DYNODEN-MULTIPLIKATOR(EN) FÜR DEN BETRIEB MIT HOHEM DYNAMIKBEREICH | [2019/47] | English: | MASS SPECTROMETER HAVING MULTI-DYNODE MULTIPLIER(S) OF HIGH DYNAMIC RANGE OPERATION | [2019/47] | French: | SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE AYANT UN OU PLUSIEURS MULTIPLICATEURS MULTI-DYNODES DE FONCTIONNEMENT À PLAGE DYNAMIQUE ÉLEVÉE | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 19.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | IT | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | LU | 02.04.2023 | FR | 22.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 02.04.2023 | ||
FR | 22.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 02.04.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 02.04.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4136280 (HUNT DONALD F, et al) [A] 13 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 28 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5401965 (KANEKO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 13 * column 3, line 9 - line 45 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2005017170 (SCHWARTZ JAE C [US], et al) [A] 13,14 * paragraph [0036] * * figure 3 *; | [YD]US7047144 (STEINER URS [US]) [YD] 8,9 * column 7, line 18 - line 27 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 4 * * column 8, line 5 - line 33 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 3 *; | [AD]US7109463 (MILSHTEIN EREL [IL], et al) [AD] 1-9,11,12,15,16 * column 5, line 40 - line 45 * * column 8, line 36 - line 52 * * figure 4c *; | [A]WO2014042037 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [A] 13,14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2015325420 (COLLINGS BRUCE ANDREW [CA], et al) [A] 14 * paragraph [0023] ** figures 2,3 *; | [XY]US2016379809 (BADIEI HAMID [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,11-16 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0071] * [Y] 8-10; | [Y]US2017352515 (HOSEA JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * * figures 2,3 * | by applicant | US6841936 | US3997779 | US7047144 | US7109463 | US7745781 | US7855361 | US8637811 | US9269552 | US9396914 | US9625417 |