EP3560593 - CARTRIDGE FOR DIGITAL REAL-TIME PCR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/44] | CATRIDGE FOR DIGITAL REAL-TIME PCR | ||
[2023/49] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTOLANE Technologies Inc. 6F, 20, Pangyoyeok-ro 241 Bundang-gu Seongnam-shi, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLEKSANDROV, Sergiy 5-205, Yeogisan-ro 54, Gwonseon-gu Sunwon-shi, Gyonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Do Young 31-203, Guhyundae APT, Apgujeongro29gil 71 Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
SONG, Min Sik 206-711, Songgangcheongsol APT Songgang-ro43bun-gil 61 Yuseong-gu, Daejon-shi / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Kyung Hak 1406-202, Dongbaekpyongchon-ro 15, Giheung-gu Yongin-shi, Gyonggi-do / KR | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 19167016.5 | 03.04.2019 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | KR20180047632 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180047632 | KR20190034671 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190034671 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560593 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560593 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L7/00, G01N15/14, G01N21/64, C12Q1/686, // G01N35/00 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP);
B01L3/502723 (EP,CN,US);
B01L3/502746 (US);
B01L3/50273 (EP);
B01L7/52 (EP,CN);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/6452 (EP);
B01L2200/0668 (EP);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,CN);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2200/12 (EP);
B01L2300/0627 (EP);
B01L2300/0816 (EP);
B01L2300/0864 (EP);
B01L2300/0893 (EP);
B01L2300/123 (EP);
B01L2300/161 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2523/313, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2527/146, C12Q2565/607, C12Q2565/629 (EP);
C12Q1/686, C12Q2561/113, C12Q2563/107, C12Q2565/629 (CN) |
Former IPC [2019/44] | B01L3/00, B01L7/00, G01N15/14, G01N21/64, // G01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE FÜR DIGITALE ECHTZEIT-PCR | [2019/44] | English: | CARTRIDGE FOR DIGITAL REAL-TIME PCR | [2023/49] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE PCR NUMÉRIQUE EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2019/44] |
Former [2019/44] | CATRIDGE FOR DIGITAL REAL-TIME PCR | Examination procedure | 08.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 08.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004132059 (SCURATI MARIO [IT], et al); | [I]US2012196767 (COONEY CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al); | [A]US2014038193 (SPOTO GIUSEPPE EMANUELE [IT], et al); | [A]US2016339427 (WIKTOR PETER [US]) |