EP3718511 - RESURFACING CUP FOR ACETABULUM HEMIARTHROPLASTY OF THE HIP JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scyon Orthopaedics AG Hardturmstrasse 103 8005 Zürich / CH | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tepic, Slobodan Kaeferholzstrasse 34 CH-8005 Zurich / CH | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 19167201.3 | 04.04.2019 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718511 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34, A61F2/32 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/32 (EP);
A61F2002/30655 (EP);
A61F2002/30657 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30935 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3225 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENERSATZ HÜFTGELENKPFANNE FÜR EINE HÜFTE HEMIARTHROPLASTIE | [2020/41] | English: | RESURFACING CUP FOR ACETABULUM HEMIARTHROPLASTY OF THE HIP JOINT | [2020/41] | French: | COUPELLE ACETABULAIRE DE RESURFAÇAGE POUR HÉMI-ARTHROPLASTIE DE L'HANCHE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4031570 (FREY OTTO) [X] 1,2,12,14* the whole document *; | [Y]US2007032877 (WHITESIDE LEO A [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]US2007208428 (TEPIC SLOBODAN [CH], et al) [Y] 8-11 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2010063589 (TEPIC SLOBODAN [CH]) [X] 1-6,12,14 * paragraphs [0067] - [0088] * [Y] 7-11 | by applicant | US7776097 | US8323346 | US2013060345 |