EP3719970 - DRIVE UNIT WITH AN INTERNAL COOLING OF ELECTRONIC ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deeg, Christian Schwenterstr. 2 90518 Altdorf / DE | 02 /
Kuhn, Harald Tauroggenstraße 10 90491 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Maidorn, Mischa Am Haselgraben 13 90547 Stein / DE | 04 /
Mächtel, Stefan Köhlerstrasse 17 91334 Hemhofen-Zeckern / DE | 05 /
Tischmacher, Hans Königsberger Str. 9 91207 Lauf / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 19167301.1 | 04.04.2019 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719970 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/18, H02K7/11, H02K9/06, H02K9/14, H02K11/33 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
H02K7/11 (EP);
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K5/18 (EP);
H02K9/06 (EP);
H02K9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINHEIT MIT EINER INNENKÜHLUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN ANBAUTEILS | [2020/41] | English: | DRIVE UNIT WITH AN INTERNAL COOLING OF ELECTRONIC ATTACHMENT | [2020/41] | French: | UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À REFROIDISSEMENT INTERNE D'UN ÉLÉMENT RAPPORTÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102004031399 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * sentence 23, paragraph 15; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]CN204858754U (UNIV HENAN NORMAL) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH07245888 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] *; | [Y]JP2007151379 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y]US2015130386 (ZUMSTEIN JARED D [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0031] , [0040] , [0068]; figures 1,10A,10B *; | [Y]US6141217 (NAKAHAMA TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 59; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | DE19812729 | DE3842588 |