EP3719207 - UNDERGROUND WALL MILLING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CREATING A MILLED SLIT IN THE GROUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUER Maschinen GmbH BAUER-Str. 1 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIXLER, Leonhard Michael-Maier-Str. 16 86672 Thierhaupten / DE | 02 /
FINKENZELLER, Stefan Bachhäcker 9 85084 Reichertshofen / DE | 03 /
HERRMANN, Christian Erzgebirgsstr. 6 86551 Aichach / DE | 04 /
PLATZEK, Peter An der Weilach 20 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/41] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19167353.2 | 04.04.2019 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719207 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3719207 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E02D17/13, E02F3/20 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
E02D17/13 (EP,KR);
E02F3/205 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2045 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | SCHLITZWANDFRÄSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FRÄSEN EINES FRÄSSCHLITZES IM BODEN | [2020/41] | English: | UNDERGROUND WALL MILLING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CREATING A MILLED SLIT IN THE GROUND | [2020/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FRAISAGE D'UNE FOUILLE DE FONDATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FRAISAGE D'UNE FOUILLE DANS LE SOL | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 19.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2019 | AL | 23.03.2022 | CY | 23.03.2022 | CZ | 23.03.2022 | DK | 23.03.2022 | EE | 23.03.2022 | FI | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | LT | 23.03.2022 | LV | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | MK | 23.03.2022 | MT | 23.03.2022 | NL | 23.03.2022 | PL | 23.03.2022 | RO | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SE | 23.03.2022 | SI | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | IE | 04.04.2022 | LU | 04.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | NO | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | PT | 25.07.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 04.04.2019 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.03.2022 | |
NO | 23.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2573475 (SOLETANCHE [FR]) [X] 11 * abstract *[A] 1-10,12-15; | [XDA]EP0518297 (BAUER SPEZIALTIEFBAU [DE]) [XD] 11 * column 3, lines 10-22; figure 1 * [A] 1-10,12-15; | [XDA]DE602004008375T (CIE DU SOL [FR]) [XD] 11,12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0033]; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 1-10,13-15; | [XDA]EP3208384 (BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [XD] 11 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * [A] 1-10,12-15 | by applicant | EP0518297 | DE102004013790 | DE602004008375T | EP3208384 |