EP3550568 - GRAPH CONVOLUTION BASED GENE PRIORITIZATION ON HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Correction of patent specification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, Thomas Tata Consultancy Services Limited Gopalan Global Axis SEZ "H" Block No. 152 (Sy No. 147,157 & 158), Hoody Village 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 02 /
RAO, Aditya Tata Consultancy Services Limited Gopalan Global Axis SEZ "H" Block No. 152 (Sy No. 147,157 & 158), Hoody Village 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 03 /
SIVADASAN, Naveen Tata Consultancy Services Limited Deccan Park Plot No 1 Survey No. 64/2, Software Units Layout, Serilingampally Mandal, Madhapur, Hyderabad 500034 Hyderabad - Telangana / IN | 04 /
VANGALA, Saipradeep Govindakrishnan Tata Consultancy Services Limited Gopalan Global Axis SEZ "H" Block No. 152 (Sy No. 147,157 & 158), Hoody Village 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 05 /
KOTTE, Sujatha Tata Consultancy Services Limited Deccan Park Plot No 1, Survey No. 64/2 Software Units Layout, Serilingampally Mandal, Madhapur, Hyderabad 500034 Hyderabad - Telangana / IN | 06 /
SRINIVASAN, Rajgopal Tata Consultancy Services Limited Deccan Park, Plot No 1 Survey No. 64/2 Software Units Layout, Serilingampally Mandal, Madhapur, Hyderabad 500034 Hyderabad - Telangana / IN | [2023/50] |
Former [2019/41] | 01 /
JOSEPH, Thomas Tata Consultancy Services Limited Gopalan Global Axis SEZ "H" Block No. 152 (Sy No. 147,157 & 158), Hoody Village 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | ||
02 /
RAO, Aditya Tata Consultancy Services Limited Gopalan Global Axis SEZ "H" Block No. 152 (Sy No. 147,157 & 158), Hoody Village 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | |||
03 /
SIVADASAN, Naveen Tata Consultancy Services Limited Deccan Park Plot No 1 Survey No. 64/2, Software Units Layout, Serilingampally Mandal, Madhapur, Hyderabad 500034 Hyderabad - Telangana / IN | |||
04 /
VANGALA, Saipradeep Govindarkrishnan Tata Consultancy Services Limited Gopalan Global Axis SEZ "H" Block No. 152 (Sy No. 147,157 & 158), Hoody Village 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | |||
05 /
KOTTE, Sujatha Tata Consultancy Services Limited Deccan Park Plot No 1, Survey No. 64/2 Software Units Layout, Serilingampally Mandal, Madhapur, Hyderabad 500034 Hyderabad - Telangana / IN | |||
06 /
AMERICAN, Rajgopal Tata Consultancy Services Limited Deccan Park, Plot No 1 Survey No. 64/2 Software Units Layout, Serilingampally Mandal, Madhapur, Hyderabad 500034 Hyderabad - Telangana / IN | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 19167464.7 | 05.04.2019 | [2019/41] | Priority number, date | IN201821013349 | 07.04.2018 Original published format: IN201821013349 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550568 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3550568 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3550568 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16B50/10, G16B35/10, G16B45/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G16B50/10 (EP,US);
G16H70/60 (US);
G06F16/288 (US);
G06F16/9024 (US);
G06N5/04 (US);
G16B35/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUF GRAPHFALTUNG BASIERENDE GENPRIORISIERUNG IN HETEROGENEN NETZWERKEN | [2019/41] | English: | GRAPH CONVOLUTION BASED GENE PRIORITIZATION ON HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS | [2019/41] | French: | PRIORISATION DE GÈNES BASÉE SUR LA CONVOLUTION GRAPHIQUE SUR DES RÉSEAUX HÉTÉROGÈNES | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 09.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 |