EP3608330 - SYNTHETIC INTERMEDIATES FOR PREPARING OLIGOSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 50 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Clark Q. 353 Dutton Road Sudbury, MA 01766 / US | 02 /
ZHENG, Xiaoyang 18 Murray Terrace Newton, MA 02465 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Robert J. 120 Northridge Drive East Bridgewater, MA 02333 / US | 04 /
KUTZKO, Joseph P. 15 Newton Street Southborough, MA 01772 / US | 05 /
ZHU, Yunxiang 10 Caulfield Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 06 /
PATTERSON, Duncan E. Ruedi-Walter-Strasse 2A 8050 Zurich / CH | 07 /
PEER, Andreas Anergis A Biopole III Route de la Corniche 9B 1066 Epalinges / CH | 08 /
KONOWICZ, Paul A. 35 Thoreau Circle Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 09 /
AVILA, Luis Z. 11 Sleepy Hollow Lane Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 10 /
STEFANO, James E. 199 Saddlehill Road Hopkinton, MA 01701 / US | 11 /
REARDON, Michael R. 77 Arnold Road North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | 12 /
HARRAHY, John 8 Autumn Road Medway, MA 02053 / US | 13 /
ZHOU, Qun 15 Harris Lane Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 14 /
YOUNG, Lauren 210 Landing Road Hampton, NH 03842 / US | 15 /
FINN, Patrick 909 Pleasant Street Unit 16 Weymouth, MA 02183 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/45] |
Former [2020/07] | Rai, Monika, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19167964.6 | 11.12.2009 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | US200812285108P | 16.12.2008 Original published format: US 12285108 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3608330 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3608330 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608330 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04, A61P3/00, A61K47/61 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,BR,IL,US);
A61K38/46 (CN,IL,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,BR,IL,US);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZUR VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OLIGOSACCHARID-PROTEIN-KONJUGATE | [2020/07] | English: | SYNTHETIC INTERMEDIATES FOR PREPARING OLIGOSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATES | [2020/07] | French: | INTERMÉDIAIRES SYNTHÉTIQUES UTILES DANS LA PRÉPARATION DES CONJUGUÉS OLIOGOSACCHARIDE-PROTÉINE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 11.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09771640.1 / EP2376123 | EP12160009.2 / EP2465542 | EP14194176.5 / EP2889043 | Divisional application(s) | EP22205652.5 / EP4212541 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MK | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | TR | 09.11.2022 | LU | 11.12.2022 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | EE | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MK | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | EE | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | EE | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
LU | 11.12.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | EE | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005058634 (ZHU YUNXIANG [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0086] *; | [A]WO2008089403 (GENZYME CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0106]; figure 1; claim 2; compounds 1-3 *; | [A] - SUGAWARA T ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF OMEGA-(METHOXYCARBONYL)ALKYL AND 9-(METHOXYCARBONYL)-3,6-DIOXANONYL GLYCOPYRANOSIDES FOR THE PREPARATION OF CARBOHYDRATE-PROTEIN CONJUGATES", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, (19920101), vol. 230, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0008-6215(00)90517-2, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 117 - 150, XP001018683 [A] 1-8 * page 123, last paragraph; page 118, paragraph 3; compound 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)90517-2 | [A] - SLODKI ET AL, "Phosphate linkages in phosphomannans from yeast", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3002, (19620101), pages 525 - 533, (19620101), XP027177746 [A] 1-8 * page 526, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US4671958 | US4867973 | US5153312 | US5212298 | US5280113 | US5306492 | US5324663 | US5521290 | US5691154 | US5846728 | US5952516 | US6066626 | US6071890 | US6156547 | US6287857 | US6472506 | US2003050299 | US6534300 | US6541669 | US2003087868 | US6573337 | US2003153768 | US6670165 | US6723843 | US6861242 | US6905856 | US2005222244 | US2005267094 | US7001994 | US7019131 | US2006228348 | US7141676 | US7160517 | US7176185 | US7232805 | WO2008089403 | - GAA. ZHU et al., Biochem. J., (20050000), vol. 389, pages 619 - 628 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19910000), vol. 266, pages 21687 - 21692 | - BALAJI et al., Glycobiology, (19940000), vol. 4, pages 497 - 515 | - OLSON et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, pages 34000 - 34009 | - OLSON et al., EMBO J., (20040000), vol. 23, pages 2019 - 2028 | - OLSON et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, pages 29889 - 29886 | - OLSON et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 10156 - 10161 | - DUFFELS et al., Chem, Eur. J., (20000000), vol. 6, pages 1416 - 1430 | - HOJO et al., Current Prot. Peptide Sci., (20000000), vol. 1, pages 23 - 48 | - SEEBERGER, Nature, (20070000), vol. 446, pages 1046 - 1051 | - SEEBERGER et al., Nature Rev. Drug Discov., (20050000), vol. 4, pages 751 - 763 | - SRIVASTANA et al., Carbohydrate Res., (19870000), vol. 161, pages 195 - 210 | - HAGIHARA et al., Chem. Rec., (20060000), vol. 6, pages 290 - 302 | - BERKOWITZ et al., Org. Lett., (20040000), vol. 6, pages 4921 - 4924 | - CRICH et al., Tetrahedron, (19980000), vol. 54, pages 8321 - 8348 | - KIM et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20080000), vol. 130, pages 8537 - 8547 | - SRIVASTA et al., Tetrahedron Letters, (19790000), vol. 35, pages 3269 - 3272 | - HODOSI et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19970000), vol. 119, pages 2335 - 2336 | - NICOLAOU et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19970000), vol. 119, pages 9057 - 9058 | - GARMAN et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 337, pages 319 - 335 | - GARMAN et al., Mol. Genet. Metabol., (20020000), vol. 77, pages 3 - 11 | - MATSUZAWA et al., Hum. Genet., (20050000), vol. 117, pages 317 - 328 | - MARTINIUK et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 9641 - 9644 | - HOEFSLOOT et al., Biochem. J., (19900000), vol. 272, pages 493 - 497 | - MORELAND et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 6780 - 6791 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NM_000152 | - LOVERING et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 2105 - 2115 | - LANSMANN et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (20030000), vol. 270, pages 1076 - 1088 | - SETO et al., Protein Sci., (20040000), vol. 13, pages 3172 - 3186 | - QIU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 32744 - 32752 | - TAKAHASHI et al., Tokohu J. Exp. Med., (20050000), vol. 206, pages 333 - 340 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AI587087 | - SCOTT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 9695 - 9699 | - SCOTT et al., Genomics, (19920000), vol. 13, pages 1311 - 1313 | - SCOTT et al., Hum. Mutat., (19950000), vol. 6, pages 288 - 302 | - REMPEL et al., Mol. Genet. Metab., (20050000), vol. 85, pages 28 - 37 | - DURAND et al., Glycobiology, (19970000), vol. 7, pages 277 - 284 | - BEESLEY et al., Hum. Genet., (20010000), vol. 109, pages 503 - 511 | - BROOKS et al., Glycobiology, (20010000), vol. 11, pages 741 - 750 | - NIEMAN et al., Biochemistry, (20030000), vol. 42, pages 8054 - 8065 | - FLOMEN et al., Hum. Mol. Genet., (19930000), vol. 2, pages 5 - 10 | - ROBERTS et al., J. Med. Genet., (19890000), vol. 26, pages 309 - 313 | - WILSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 8531 - 8535 | - WILSON et al., Genomics, (19930000), vol. 17, pages 773 - 775 | - SUKEGWA-HAYASAKA et al., J. Inherit. Metab. Dis, (20060000), vol. 29, pages 755 - 761 | - KIM et al., Hum. Mutat., (20030000), vol. 21, pages 193 - 201 | - LITJENS et al., Hum. Mut., (19920000), vol. 1, pages 397 - 402 | - PETERS et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19900000), vol. 265, pages 3374 - 3381 | - SCHUCHMAN et al., Genomics, (19900000), vol. 6, pages 149 - 158 | - BOND et al., Structure, (19970000), vol. 15, pages 277 - 289 | - ZHU et al., Biochem. J., (20050000), vol. 389, pages 619 - 628 | - ZHU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, pages 50336 - 50341 | - WANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 56 - 61 | - LI et al., Clin. Chem., (20040000), vol. 50, pages 1785 - 1796 | - CIVALLERO et al., Clin. Chim. Acta, (20060000), vol. 372, pages 98 - 102 | - VAN DIGGELEN et al., J. Inherit. Metab. Dis., (20050000), vol. 28, pages 733 - 741 | - DOWNING et al., Plant Biotechnol., (20060000), vol. 4, pages 169 - 181 | - VOZNYI et al., J. Inherit. Metab. Dis., (20010000), vol. 24, pages 675 - 80 | - MURRAY et al., Mol. Genet. Metab., (20070000), vol. 90, pages 307 - 312 | - BROOKS et al., J. Inher. Metab. Dis., (19910000), vol. 14, pages 5 - 12 | - KIKUCHI et al., J. Clin. Invest., (19980000), vol. 101, pages 827 - 33 | - KAKKIS et al., Mol. Genet. Metab., (20010000), vol. 72, pages 199 - 208 | - LOANNOU et al., Am. J. Hum. Genet., (20010000), vol. 68, pages 14 - 25 | - HORINOUCHI et al., Nat. Genet., (19950000), vol. 10, pages 288 - 293 | - BERGE et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - KAKKIS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20040000), vol. 101, pages 829 - 834 | - UMPATHYSIVAM et al., Clin. Chem., (20010000), vol. 47, pages 1378 - 1383 | - MACDERMOTT et al., J. Med. Genet., (20010000), vol. 38, pages 750 - 760 | - PEKARI et al., J. Org. Chem., (20010000), vol. 66, page 7432 | - YAMAZAKI et al., Carb. Res., (19900000), vol. 201, page 31 | - HENG et al., J. Carb. Chem., (20010000), vol. 20, page 285 | - MAYER et al., EurJ. Org. Chem., (19990000), vol. 10, page 2563 | - ZHU et al., Biochem J, (20050000), vol. 389, pages 619 - 628 | - RABEN et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, no. 30, pages 19086 - 92 | - LEE et al., Pharm. Res., (20030000), vol. 20, pages 818 - 825 | US20070885457 | US20070885471 | US20080122851 |