EP3721896 - EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR (EGF) AND VARIANTS THEREOF FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY DEMYELINATING DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/42] | EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR (EGF) AND VARIANTS THEREOF FOR MEDICAL USES IN NEURO-DE/REGENERATION | ||
[2023/27] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scalabrino, Giuseppe Via della Braida 10 20122 Milano / IT | For all designated states Nicoletti, Ferdinando Via Luigi Sturzo nr. 3 95021 Aci Castello, Catania / IT | For all designated states Lang, Alois Bernhard Hauptstrasse 36a 3033 Wohlen b. Bern / CH | For all designated states Curtin, Francois Avenue de la Forteaille 20 1292 Chambesy / CH | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 19167967.9 | 08.04.2019 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721896 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721896 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61P25/28, G01N33/68 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/1808 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
G01N33/68 (EP);
G01N33/6896 (EP);
G01N2333/485 (EP);
G01N2800/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EPIDERMALER WACHSTUMSFAKTOR (EGF) UND VARIANTEN DAVON ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG VON INFLAMMATORISCHEN DEMYELINISIERENDEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/48] | English: | EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR (EGF) AND VARIANTS THEREOF FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY DEMYELINATING DISORDERS | [2023/27] | French: | FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ÉPIDERMIQUE (EGF) ET SES VARIANTES POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PRÉVENTION DE TROUBLES INFLAMMATOIRES DE DEMYELINISATION | [2023/27] |
Former [2020/42] | EPIDERMALER WACHSTUMSFAKTOR (EGF) UND VARIANTEN DAVON FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNGEN IN DER NEURO-DE/REGENERATION | ||
Former [2020/42] | EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR (EGF) AND VARIANTS THEREOF FOR MEDICAL USES IN NEURO-DE/REGENERATION | ||
Former [2020/42] | FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ÉPIDERMIQUE (EGF) ET SES VARIANTES POUR UTILISATIONS MÉDICALES EN NEURO-DÉ/RÉGÉNÉRATION | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 07.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002004039 (REID JAMES STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-13 * paragraphs [0074] , [0 78]; claims 1, 3 *; | [XDY]EP1870106 (CT INGENIERIA GENETICA BIOTECH [CU]) [XD] 1,2,7-13 * examples 1, 2 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP1889852 (UNIV PAIS VASCO [ES]) [X] 1,2,8-13 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [0 57] , [0058]; claims 23-26, 28 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY] - DEL BARCO DIANA GARCÍA ET AL, "Coadministration of epidermal growth factor and growth hormone releasing peptide-6 improves clinical recovery in experimental autoimmune encephalitis.", RESTORATIVE NEUROLOGY AND NEUROSCIENCE 2011, (2011), vol. 29, no. 4, ISSN 1878-3627, pages 243 - 252, XP055619892 [X] 1,2,7-13 * table 1 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3233/RNN-2011-0595 | [X] - GOVINDAIAH VINUKONDA ET AL, "Epidermal growth factor preserves myelin and promotes astrogliosis after intraventricular hemorrhage : Epidermal Growth Factor and IVH", GLIA, (20160729), vol. 64, no. 11, doi:10.1002/glia.23037, ISSN 0894-1491, pages 1987 - 2004, XP055620010 [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 1988, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/glia.23037 | [Y] - ALMAZAN G ET AL, "Epidermal growth factor and bovine growth hormone stimulate differentiation and myelination of brain cell aggregates in culture", DEVELOPMENTAL BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0165-3806(85)90214-7, ISSN 0165-3806, (19850801), pages 257 - 264, (19850801), XP025413654 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-3806(85)90214-7 | [Y] - KNAPP P E ET AL, "Epidermal growth factor promotes oligodendrocyte process formation and regrowth after injury", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040318), vol. 296, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YEXCR.2004.02.007, ISSN 0014-4827, pages 135 - 144, XP002395583 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2004.02.007 | [YD] - MARTA TEJERA-ALHAMBRA ET AL, "Plasma Biomarkers Discriminate Clinical Forms of Multiple Sclerosis", PLOS ONE, (20150603), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0128952, page e0128952, XP055619754 [YD] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0128952 | [A] - SCALABRINO GIUSEPPE ET AL, "Relationships between cobalamin, epidermal growth factor, and normal prions in the myelin maintenance of central nervous system", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, (20140917), vol. 55, doi:10.1016/J.BIOCEL.2014.09.011, ISSN 1357-2725, pages 232 - 241, XP029020040 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biocel.2014.09.011 | [XP] - NICOLETTI FERDINANDO ET AL, "Prevention of clinical and histological signs of MOG-induced experimental allergic encephalomyelitis by prolonged treatment with recombinant human EGF", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (20190508), vol. 332, doi:10.1016/J.JNEUROIM.2019.05.006, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 224 - 232, XP085694222 [XP] 1-13 * paragraph [2.2.3; 3.2.3; 3.2.4]; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneuroim.2019.05.006 | by applicant | WO9203476 | US5268164 | WO9325234 | WO9406920 | US5506206 | US5527527 | US5686416 | US5833988 | US5977307 | US6015555 | US6329508 | EP1870106 | - LOVE S., J Clin Pathol., (20060000), vol. 59, no. 11, pages 1151 - 9 | - ZENG F; HARRIS RC, Semin Cell Dev Biol., (20140000), vol. 28, pages 2 - 11 | - WEE P; WANG Z, Cancers, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 5, page 52 | - WIEDUWILT MJ; MOASSER MM., Cell Mol Life Sci., (20080000), vol. 65, no. 10, pages 1566 - 84 | - BROWN KD; HOLLEY RW, J Cell Physiol., (19790000), vol. 100, no. 1, pages 139 - 46 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. P01133-1 | - STEPHEN F. ALTSCHUL; THOMAS L. MADDEN; ALEJANDRO A. SCHAFFER; JINGHUI ZHANG; ZHENG ZHANG; WEBB MILLER; DAVID J. LIPMAN, Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ZENG F; HARRIS RC., Semin Cell Dev Biol., (20140000), vol. 28, pages 2 - 11 | - SCALABRINO G, et al., Int J Biochem Cell Biol., (20140000), vol. 55, pages 232 - 41 | - CHANDRAN S et al., Glia, (19980000), vol. 24, no. 4, pages 382 - 9 | - PFEIFFER SE et al., Trends Cell Biol., (19930000), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 191 - 7 | - KNAPP PE et al., Exp Cell Res., (20040000), vol. 296, no. 2, pages 135 - 44 | - SCAFIDI J et al., Nature, (20140000), vol. 506, no. 7487, pages 230 - 4 | - GONZALEZ-PEREZ O et al., Stem Cells., (20090000), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 2032 - 43 | - BIEBER AJ et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20100000), vol. 107, no. 2, pages 792 - 7 | - SCALABRINO G et al., "Epidermal growth factor as a local mediator of the neurotrophic action of vitamin B(12) (cobalamin) in the rat central nervous system", FASEB J., (19990000), vol. 13, no. 14, pages 2083 - 90 | - SCALABRINO G et al., J Neuropathol Exp Neurol., (20000000), vol. 59, no. 9, pages 808 - 14 | - GUDI V et al., PLoS One, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 7, page e22623 | - SCALABRINO G et al., Brain Res., (20100528), vol. 1333, pages 64 - 71 | - SCALABRINO G. et al., Neuroscience, (20150000), vol. 298, pages 293 - 301 | - TEJERA-ALHAMBRA M et al., PLoS One, (20150000), vol. 10, no. 6, page e0128952 | - AMIR-LEVY Y et al., Mult Scler Int., (20140000), page 926134 | - DEL BARCO DG et al., J. Restor Neurol Neurosci., (20110000), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 243 - 52 | - SHIN T et al., "Mechanism of experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis in Lewis rats: recent insights from macrophages", Anat Cell Biol., (20120000), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 141 - 8 | - MANGANO K et al., J Cell Physiol., (20140000), vol. 229, no. 12, pages 1918 - 25 | - EUGSTER HP et al., Eur J Immunol., (19990000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 626 - 32 | - Magn. Reson. Med., vol. 58, pages 298 - 305 | - LARSEN et al., "Matrix metalloproteinase-9 facilitates remyelination in part by processing the inhibitory NG2 proteoglycan", J. Neuroscience, (20030000), vol. 23, pages 11127 - 35 | - BRUNDULA et al., Brain, (20020000), vol. 125, page 1297 | - GIULIANI et al., J Neuroimmunol, (20050000), vol. 165, no. 83 | - BTOCHOWIAK KJ et al., Adv Clin Exp Med., (20180400), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 455 - 461 | - MILLER, A. D., Blood, (19900000), vol. 76, page 271 | - ROUX et al., PNAS, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 9079 - 9083 | - JULAN et al., J. Gen Virol, (19920000), vol. 73, pages 3251 - 3255 | - GOUD et al., Virology, (19830000), vol. 163, pages 251 - 254 | - NEDA et al., J. Biol Chem, (19910000), vol. 266, pages 14143 - 14146 | - MAYO L et al., Immunol Rev., (20120000), vol. 248, no. 1, pages 170 - 87 | - POSER et al., Neurology, (19830000), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 227 - 230 | - BREX et al., N Engl J Med., (20020000), vol. 346, no. 3, pages 158 - 64 | - FROHMAN et al., Neurology., (20030000), vol. 61, no. 5, pages 602 - 11 | - HUGHES; CORNBLATH, Lancet, (20050000), vol. 366, pages 1653 - 1666 | - KAIDA et al., J. Neuroimmunol., (20090000), vol. 182, pages 212 - 218 | - ARIGA; YU, J. Neurosci. Res., (20050000), vol. 80, pages 1 - 17 | - YU et al., J. Lipid Res., (20040000), vol. 45, pages 783 - 793 | - REGINA TODESCHINI; HAKOMORI, Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20080000), vol. 1780, pages 421 - 433 | - LANGMUIR et al., Am J Epidemiol, (19840000), vol. 119, pages 841 - 879 | - KUWABARA, Drugs, (20040000), vol. 64, pages 597 - 610 | - SOUAYAH et al., Vaccine, (20070000), vol. 25, pages 5253 - 5255 | - HUGHES et al., J Neuroimmunol, (19990000), vol. 100, pages 74 - 97 | - HADDEN et al., Neurology, (20010000), vol. 56, pages 758 - 765 | - SIVADON-TARDY et al., Emerg Infect Dis, (20060000), vol. 12, pages 990 - 993 | - SIVADON-TARDY et al., Clin Infect Dis, (20090000), vol. 48, pages 48 - 56 | - GELEIJNS et al., Neurology, (20050000), vol. 64, pages 44 - 49 | - CAPORALE et al., J Neuroimmunol, (20060000), vol. 177, pages 112 - 118 | - YUKI, Muscle Nerve, (20070000), vol. 35, pages 691 - 711 | - YUKI et al., Neurology, (19900000), vol. 40, pages 1900 - 1902 | - USUKI et al., J Neurosci Res, (20060000), vol. 83, pages 274 - 284 | - RINALDI; WILLISON, Curr Opin Neurol, (20080000), vol. 21, pages 540 - 546 | - VAN DOOM et al., Lancet Neural, (20080000), vol. 7, pages 939 - 950 | - KAIDA et al., Glycobiology, (20090000), vol. 19, pages 676 - 692 | - KISSEL JT et al., Seminars in Neurology, (20030000), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 169 - 80 | - SCALABRINO G et al., Brain Res., (20100000), vol. 1333, pages 64 - 71 | - DONIA M; MANGANO K; QUATTROCCHI C; FAGONE P; SIGNORELLI S; MAGRO G; SFACTERIA A; BENDTZEN K; NICOLETTI F, "Specific and strain-independent effects of dexamethasone in the prevention and treatment of experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis in rodents", Scand J Immunol., (20101100), vol. 72, no. 5, pages 396 - 407 | - MAGRO G; SFACTERIA A; BENDTZEN K; NICOLETTI F, "Specific and strain-independent effects of dexamethasone in the prevention and treatment of experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis in rodents", Scand J Immunol., (20101100), vol. 72, no. 5, pages 396 - 407 | - SCALABRINO G.; LORENZINI E.C.; MONZIO-COMPAGNONI B.; COLOMBI R.P.; CHIODINI E.; BUCCELLATO F.R., "Subacute combined degeneration in the spinal cord of totally gastrectomized rats. Ornithine decarboxylase induction, cobalamin status, and astroglial reaction", Lab. Invest., (19950000), vol. 72, pages 114 - 123 | - MANGANO K; FAGONE P; BENDTZEN K; MERONI PL; QUATTROCCHI C; MAMMANA S; DI ROSA M; MALAGUARNERA L; COCO M; MAGRO G, "Hypomethylating agent 5-aza-2'-deoxycytidine (DAC) ameliorates multiple sclerosis in mouse models", J Cell Physiol., (20141200), vol. 229, no. 12, pages 1918 - 25 | - FURLAN R; POLIANI PL; GALBIATI F; BERGAMI A; GRIMALDI LM; COMI G; ADORINI L; MARTINO G, "Central nervous system delivery of interleukin 4 by a non replicative herpes simplex type 1 viral vector ameliorates autoimmune demyelination", Hum Gene Ther., (19981120), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 2605 - 17 | - DONIA M et al., Scand J Immunol., (20100000), vol. 72, no. 5, pages 396 - 407 |