EP3549463 - AEROSOL GENERATING SYSTEM WITH MEANS FOR DISABLING CONSUMABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLICK, Jean-Marc Rue de la Poste 3 1405 Pomy / CH | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP, et al The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/17] | Ponder, William Anthony John, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | ||
Former [2019/41] | Sánchez García, Juan Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19168360.6 | 22.12.2011 | [2019/41] | Priority number, date | EP20100252236 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10252236 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549463 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3549463 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A61L9/03 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
A24F40/53 (EP,EA,US);
A24D3/17 (KR);
A24F47/00 (EA);
A24F40/40 (US);
A24F40/50 (US);
A61L9/037 (EP,US);
B63C9/115 (US);
F41H1/02 (US);
H05B1/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM MIT MITTELN ZUR DEAKTIVIERUNG VON VERBRAUCHSMATERIAL | [2019/41] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATING SYSTEM WITH MEANS FOR DISABLING CONSUMABLE | [2019/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL AYANT DES MOYENS POUR DÉSACTIVER UN CONSOMMABLE | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 08.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11811345.5 / EP2654471 | EP14172111.8 / EP2870888 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0358002 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]); | [X]US5095921 (LOSEE D BRUCE [US], et al); | [X]GB2263068 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0893071 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [X]EP1211628 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]WO2010045671 (BUCHBERGER HELMUT [AT]); | [X]US7779831 (VON HOLLEN DIRK [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2007078273 |