EP3556980 - HINGE FOR CONTROLLING INCLINED DOORS OR DOOR-LEAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states In & Tec S.r.l. Via Guglielmo Oberdan 1/A 25128 Brescia / IT | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bacchetti, Luciano Via Della Fonte, 9/C 25075 Nave / IT | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Autuori, Angelo Autuori & Partners Strada del Megiaro, 261 36100 Vicenza (VI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Autuori, Angelo Eureka IP Consulting Via Monte Cengio, 32 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 19169402.5 | 16.04.2019 | [2019/43] | Priority number, date | IT20180004608 | 17.04.2018 Original published format: IT201800004608 | [2019/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556980 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/06, E05F1/12, E05F3/20 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
E05F1/1261 (EP);
E05F1/068 (EP);
E05F3/20 (EP);
E05Y2201/638 (EP);
E05Y2900/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] |
Former [2019/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIER ZUR KONTROLLE VON GENEIGTEN TÜREN ODER TÜRBLÄTTERN | [2019/43] | English: | HINGE FOR CONTROLLING INCLINED DOORS OR DOOR-LEAVES | [2019/43] | French: | CHARNIÈRE POUR LA COMMANDE DE PORTES OU DE FEUILLES DE PORTE INCLINÉES | [2019/43] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 23.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2071993 (ALTURA LEIDEN HOLDING [NL]) [Y] 15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 5 *; | [A]AU2010100487 (CHOW CHUNG [HK]) [A] 1,5,10-12,14 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 23 * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 12 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 16 ** figures 1, 2, 5 *; | [XY]WO2012049518 (CHOW CHUNG [CN]) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 17 - page 4, line 7 * * page 6, lines 22-25 * * page 13, lines 12-14 * * page 15, line 15 - page 17, line 28 * * page 24, line 23 - page 26, line 6 * * figures 1-5, 18, 19, 24-29 * [Y] 15; | [XAI]GB2525444 (BESTKO PREC LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4,11,12,14 * figures 1, 2, 7-9 * * page 3, lines 27-35 * * page 4, lines 9-34 * * page 8, lines 8-28 * * page 9, lines 8-36 * * page 11, lines 25-36 * [A] 15 [I] 5-10,13 | by applicant | WO2015US50603 |