EP3556358 - ACID RESISTANT CAPSULE SHELL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dah Feng Capsule Industry Co., Ltd. No. 203, Sec 3 Chung Shan Rd. Tan Tzu Taichung 42756 / TW | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, RUEI-JAN 203, SEC. 3, CHUNG SHAN RD. TANTZU TAICHUNG / TW | 02 /
LIN, YI-HUEI 203, SEC. 3, CHUNG SHAN RD. TANTZU TAICHUNG / TW | 03 /
LEE, PEI-HSUAN 203, SEC. 3, CHUNG SHAN RD. TANTZU TAICHUNG / TW | 04 /
CHAO, HSIN-YI 203, SEC. 3, CHUNG SHAN RD. TANTZU TAICHUNG / TW | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 19169625.1 | 16.04.2019 | [2019/43] | Priority number, date | US201815956095 | 18.04.2018 Original published format: US201815956095 | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556358 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3556358 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K47/36 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/4816 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/36 (EP);
A61K9/4833 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] |
Former [2019/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SÄUREBESTÄNDIGE KAPSELHÜLLENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/43] | English: | ACID RESISTANT CAPSULE SHELL COMPOSITION | [2019/43] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COQUE DE CAPSULE RÉSISTANTE À L'ACIDE | [2019/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 23.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1315479 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]JP2015189684 (NAKANIHON CAPSULE CO LTD) [X] 1-10,12,13,15 * example - * * claim - *; | [A]EP3178473 (DAH FENG CAPSULE IND CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * example - ** claims 1-15 *; | [XI]EP3205338 (FUJI CAPSULE CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-13,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * claim - * * claims 1-6 * [I] 5 |