EP3719339 - AN APPARATUS INCLUDING AN ADJUSTING SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING A ROTATIONAL POSITION OF A SHAFT WITH RESPECT TO A SHAFT HOLDING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gomecsys B.V. Energiestraat 23 B1 1411 AR Naarden / NL | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Gooijer, Lambertus Hendrik Landstraat 40 C2 1401 EP BUSSUM / NL | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 19170054.1 | 18.04.2019 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | EP20190167636 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19167636 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719339 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D27/08, F02B75/04, F16C3/28 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
F16C7/06 (EP);
F02B75/048 (EP);
F16C23/10 (EP);
F16C9/04 (EP);
F16D27/08 (EP);
F16C2360/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM EINSTELLSYSTEM ZUM EINSTELLEN EINER DREHPOSITION EINER WELLE IN BEZUG AUF EIN WELLENHALTEELEMENT | [2020/41] | English: | AN APPARATUS INCLUDING AN ADJUSTING SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING A ROTATIONAL POSITION OF A SHAFT WITH RESPECT TO A SHAFT HOLDING MEMBER | [2020/41] | French: | APPAREIL COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE PERMETTANT DE RÉGLER UNE POSITION DE ROTATION D'UN ARBRE PAR RAPPORT À UN ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT D'ARBRE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 01.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 18.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2008283027 (MEINTSCHEL JENS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,7 * [A] 6,8,9; | [Y]EP1884678 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [Y] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0040]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4250984 (HOYLER ALFRED, et al) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 62; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2333335 (LANSING LINDE LTD [GB]) [A] 1,8 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 7; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | WO2013110700 |