EP3569905 - VALVE DIAPHRAGM, MEMBRANE VALVE AND METHOD FOR FIXING A DATA CARRIER IN A HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemü Gebr. Müller Apparatebau GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Fritz-Müller-Straße 6-8 74653 Ingelfingen / DE | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebonte, Christophe 19 Rue des Acacias 67210 NIEDERNAI / FR | 02 /
Meier, Rolf Im Weilerberg 18 77955 Ettenheim / DE | 03 /
Knaus, Pascal Am Kocherberg 45 74670 Forchtenberg / DE | 04 /
Meinikheim, Steffen Oberginsbacher Straße 5 74653 Ingelfingen / DE | 05 /
Müller, Gert Fritz-Müller-Straße 6-8 74653 Ingelfingen / DE | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 19170088.9 | 18.04.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | DE201810111383 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018111383 | [2019/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569905 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00, F16J3/02, F16K7/12, G06K19/077 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
F16K7/12 (EP,CN,US);
F16K37/0025 (US);
F16J3/02 (EP);
F16K27/00 (CN);
F16K37/0058 (US);
F16K37/0075 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILMEMBRAN, MEMBRANVENTIL, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINES IN EINEM GEHÄUSE AUFGENOMMENEN DATENTRÄGERS | [2019/47] | English: | VALVE DIAPHRAGM, MEMBRANE VALVE AND METHOD FOR FIXING A DATA CARRIER IN A HOUSING | [2019/47] | French: | MEMBRANE DE SOUPAPE, SOUPAPE À MEMBRANE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UN SUPPORT DE DONNÉES LOGÉ DANS UN BOÎTIER | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 06.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009212912 (FORSTER DEBORAH ANNE [GB]) [Y] 4-11 * figures 1a-2b *; | [A]EP2242004 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE202011050941U (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,12-22 * paragraph [0060]; figure 2c *; | [XI]US2012119130 (REED DANIEL I [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,20-22 * paragraphs [0059] , [0062]; figures 2,7a,9c * [I] 16-19; | [A]WO2014122239 (GARZUEL FLORENT [FR]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050]; figures 2,3 *; | [XDI]DE102013214304 (GEMÜ GEBR MÜLLER APPBAU GMBH & CO KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [XD] 1,3,20,22 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0022] , [0023] , [0024] , [0033] , [0035] , [0036]; figures 1-4 * [I] 16-19; | [Y]DE102015210204 (GEMÜ GEBR MÜLLER APPBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract; figure 1 * * paragraph [0028] * |