EP3560648 - MICRO MACHINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tek 4 Limited 18 Mandervell Road Oadby Leicester, Leicestershire LE2 5LQ / GB | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duffin, Jason c/o Tek 4 Limited 18 Mandervell Road Oadby Leicester, Leicestershire LE2 5LQ / GB | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Range, Christopher William Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Range, Christopher William Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19170097.0 | 18.04.2019 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | GB20180006939 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: GB 201806939 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560648 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23H5/00, B23H9/10, B23H9/14, B23K26/402, B23K26/382, // B23H1/00 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
B23K26/389 (EP);
B23H7/38 (GB);
B23K26/382 (US);
B23H5/00 (EP);
B23H9/10 (EP);
B23H9/14 (EP);
B23K26/0093 (EP);
B23K26/03 (US);
B23K26/0823 (EP);
B23K26/0853 (EP);
B23K26/352 (US);
B23K26/364 (EP);
B23K26/402 (EP);
G05B19/401 (GB);
B23H1/00 (EP);
B23H2500/00 (EP);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
B23K2101/34 (EP);
B23K2103/26 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROBEARBEITUNG | [2019/44] | English: | MICRO MACHINING | [2019/44] | French: | MICRO-USINAGE | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]US5418345 (ADAMSKI EDWARD G [US]) [ID] 9-11 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 57 * * column 2, lines 47-50 * * column 4, lines 52-57 * * column 5, lines 3-5 * [Y] 1-8; | [X]GB2389554 (ALSTOM [CH]) [X] 12,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2007137903 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 14,15 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2009142548 (PATTERSON DAVID BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2017068231 (TAKEMOTO MASANOBU [JP], et al) [A] 3,9 * paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]US2017320163 (HU ZHAOLI [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2018085840 (JEON CHANG BOK [KR]) [A] 5,6 * figure 3 *; | [A] - LI ET AL, "Sequential Laser and EDM Micro-drilling for Next Generation Fuel Injection Nozzle Manufacture", CIRP ANNALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, CH, FR, (20060101), vol. 55, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0007-8506(07)60393-X, ISSN 0007-8506, pages 179 - 182, XP022135424 [A] 1 * paragraph [03.6] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0007-8506(07)60393-X |