EP3556471 - SPRAY GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schieffer Co. International L.C. 8545 Kapp Drive Peosta, IA 52068 / US | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEIS, Jeffrey D. 9850 Alanda Court Dubuque, IA Iowa 52003 / US | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 19170282.8 | 18.04.2019 | [2019/43] | Priority number, date | US201862659959P | 19.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862659959 P | US201916385632 | 16.04.2019 Original published format: US201916385632 | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556471 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/30, B05B15/65, B05B12/00, B05B9/00, B05B9/01 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
B05B9/01 (EP,US);
B05B11/1073 (US);
B05B12/0026 (EP,US);
B05B15/65 (EP);
B05B1/302 (EP);
B05B9/002 (EP);
B08B3/026 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] |
Former [2019/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZPISTOLE | [2019/43] | English: | SPRAY GUN | [2019/43] | French: | PISTOLET PULVÉRISATEUR | [2019/43] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 23.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3883077 (SHOWALTER OMAR V) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US4245759 (BAKER ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5833147 (FUHLBRIGGE THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | US62659959 | US2208850 | US2937813 | US5118080 | US5176327 | EP1516674 | US7516910 | US2016288148 |