EP3564075 - BUMPER WITH INTEGRATED MARKING CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus (S.A.S.) 2, Rond Point Emile Dewoitine 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERRER, Guillaume AIRBUS (S.A.S.) 2, rond-point Emile Dewoitine 31707 BLAGNAC Cedex / FR | 02 /
CHARLES, Julien AIRBUS (S.A.S.) 2, rond-point Emile Dewoitine 31707 BLAGNAC Cedex / FR | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Gicquel, Olivier Yves Gérard Airbus Opérations (S.A.S) XIF - M0101/1 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse Cedex / FR | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 19170357.8 | 19.04.2019 | [2019/45] | Priority number, date | FR20180053847 | 04.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1853847 | [2019/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564075 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564075 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/48, B62D41/00 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B60R19/48 (EP,CN,US);
B62D41/00 (EP,US);
B60R19/20 (US);
B60R2019/1866 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STOSSFÄNGER MIT INTEGRIERTER MARKIERUNGSZELLE | [2019/45] | English: | BUMPER WITH INTEGRATED MARKING CELL | [2019/45] | French: | PARE-CHOCS A CELLULE DE MARQUAGE INTEGRÉE | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 12.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2019 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | ES | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | NL | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | PT | 14.12.2020 | IE | 19.04.2021 | LU | 19.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 19.04.2019 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/41] | HU | 19.04.2019 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.04.2019 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2646016 (VERN WILSON LOYAL) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 46; figure - *; | [Y]GB1218046 (TAYLOR JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-10 * page 1, line 98 - page 4, line 117; figure - *; | [A]JPH0280467 (MATSURA CHIEO, et al) [A] 1,10* abstract *; | [A]WO0051875 (HAN SANG KWAN [KR]) [A] 1,10 * page 3, line 23 - page 6, line 15; figure - *; | [Y]US2013197717 (FRASER SPENCER [CA], et al) [Y] 1,3-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0070]; figure - * |