EP3575955 - INDIRECT MEMORY FETCHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EYERMAN, Stijn Buntstraat 26 9940 Evergem / BE | 02 /
HEIRMAN, Wim Oudenaardsesteenweg 32P 9000 Gent / BE | 03 /
DU BOIS, Kristof Linthout 22 9300 Aalst / BE | 04 /
HUR, Ibrahim 11577 NW Praline Ln Portland, OR 97229 / US | 05 /
FRYMAN, Joshua B. 2004 NW Woodland Dr Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19170431.1 | 19.04.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | US201815996184 | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US201815996184 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575955 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3575955 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30, G06F9/35 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G06F9/35 (EP);
G06F9/3802 (US);
G06F9/3004 (EP);
G06F9/30043 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/30145 (CN);
G06F9/3818 (US);
G06F9/3824 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INDIREKTER SPEICHER-FETCHER | [2019/49] | English: | INDIRECT MEMORY FETCHER | [2019/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION DE MÉMOIRE INDIRECTE | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 03.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012151156 (CITRON DANIEL [IL], et al) [I] 1,7,12,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] , [0025] , [0033] , [0036] , [0038] , [0056] *; | [X]US2013326160 (SPERBER ZEEV [IL], et al) [X] 1,7,12,15 * paragraphs [0120] , [0125] , [0126] , [0127] * * figures 4B,8A,13 *; | [XI]WO2016105755 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,6-9,12,15 * paragraphs [00143] , [00145] , [00146] , [00147] * * figures 12,13,15 * [I] 2,3,5,6,8,10,11,13,14; | [A]WO2017117458 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 2,3,13,14* paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0038] * | Examination | EP0123509 | EP0389001 |