EP3730708 - THERMALLY INSULATING CONNECTION ELEMENT AND THERMALLY INSULATING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leviat GmbH Liebigstraße 14 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2022/08] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states HALFEN GmbH Liebigstrasse 14 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remy, Olivier Locomotiefstraat 55 2800 Mechelen / BE | 02 /
Heidolf, Thorsten Merketalstrasse 13 99435 Weimar / DE | 03 /
Garke, Robert Robert-Koch-Strasse 41 99096 Erfurt / DE | 04 /
Füllsack-Köditz, Raimo Bauhausstrasse 9 99423 Weimar / DE | 05 /
Branco, Miguel 6814 Abilene dr 77493 Katy, Texas / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Annette Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 19170477.4 | 23.04.2019 | [2020/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730708 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
E04B1/0038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCH ISOLIERENDES VERBINDUNGSELEMENT UND THERMISCH ISOLIERENDES BAUELEMENT | [2020/44] | English: | THERMALLY INSULATING CONNECTION ELEMENT AND THERMALLY INSULATING COMPONENT | [2020/44] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RACCORDEMENT THERMO-ISOLANT ET COMPOSANT THERMO-ISOLANT | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 22.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP0568813 (SCHOECK BAUTEILE GMBH [DE]); | [XI]EP1680559 (HITEK CONSTRUCTION AG [CH]); | [A]US2016002920 (SESHAPPA VENKATESH [US], et al); | [XAI]DE102016113558 (SCHÖCK BAUTEILE GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | WO2005035892 | WO2017121658 |