EP3537238 - ACCESSORY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM USING ENVIRONMENT MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKS, Andrew 187 Acalanes Drive 26 Cupertino, CA California 94086 / US | 02 /
NADATHUR, Anush G. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 03 /
RAMA, Srinivas One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 04 /
MCLAUGHLIN, Kevin P. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 05 /
ABUAN, Joe One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 06 /
HASKINS, Harlan 5630 Stevens Creek Boulevard 359 Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 19170567.2 | 29.05.2015 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | US201462005764P | 30.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462005764 P | US201462094391P | 19.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462094391 P | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537238 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3537238 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02, H04L12/28 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP,CN);
H04L12/283 (EP,CN);
H04L41/22 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
H04L12/2809 (EP,CN);
H04L12/281 (EP,CN);
H04L12/2836 (EP,CN);
H04L67/025 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | ZUBEHÖRVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM MIT UMGEBUNGSMODELL | [2019/37] | English: | ACCESSORY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM USING ENVIRONMENT MODEL | [2019/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ACCESSOIRES AU MOYEN D'UN MODÈLE D'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 17.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15731760.3 / EP3149547 | Divisional application(s) | EP23174085.3 / EP4236211 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1659739 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2009057427 (GEADELMANN LEVI H [US], et al); | [A]US2009307255 (PARK YOUNGCHOON [US]); | [A]EP2148308 (UNIVERSAL ELECTRONICS INC [US]); | [A]US2011153279 (ZHANG YAJUN-EDWIN [CN], et al); | [A]WO2013049007 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [X]JP5474238B ; | [X]US2014143695 (SUNDERMEYER KEN [US], et al); | US2016147919 [ ] (YABE MASAAKI [JP], et al) |