EP3730563 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A BONDED ARTICLE BY CONDUCTING SINGLE-SIDED GLUING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 19170912.0 | 24.04.2019 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730563 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/02 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C09J5/02 (EP);
A43B13/32 (EP);
A43B23/0255 (EP);
C09J2427/006 (EP);
C09J2427/008 (EP);
C09J2475/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERKLEBTEN ARTIKELS DURCH EINSEITIGE VERKLEBUNG | [2020/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING A BONDED ARTICLE BY CONDUCTING SINGLE-SIDED GLUING | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ARTICLE LIÉ EN EFFECTUANT UN COLLAGE MONOFACE | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003084995 (ZHANG CHUNBIN [US]) [X] 10 * abstract ** paragraph [0020] - paragraphs [0024] , [0027] , [0033] , [0040] , [0044]; claims 1-3 *; | [XI]US2009208758 (D HERBECOURT BRUNO [FR], et al) [X] 10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0037] , [0038] , [0140] - paragraphs [0151] , [0155] , [0159]; claims 1-5,8-11,13,14,17 * [I] 1-9; | [X]EP2484706 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0070] , [0073] - paragraph [0078]; example -; claims 1,10,15 * | by applicant | CN1098154C | CN1235966C | CN107802056 |