EP3564165 - PICKING DEVICE FOR PICKING FROM A STORAGE CONTAINER INTO AN APPLICATION CONTAINER AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dematic GmbH Martinseestrasse 1 63150 Heusenstamm / DE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehner, Matthias Dornbergerstrasse 25 63075 Offenbach / DE | 02 /
Hartwig, Reckemeier Am Wiesengrund 12 63110 Rodgau / DE | 03 /
Polanz, Tobias Taunusblick 8 56412 Görgeshausen / DE | 04 /
Jung, Armin Hanauer Str. 82 63165 Mühlheim / DE | 05 /
Mushack, Sören Kranichsteiner Str. 81 64390 Erzhausen / DE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 19171378.3 | 26.04.2019 | [2019/45] | Priority number, date | DE201810110502 | 02.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018110502 | [2019/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564165 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137, B65G1/04 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B65G1/1375 (EP);
B65G47/90 (US);
B25J15/04 (US);
B25J5/007 (US);
B25J9/1697 (US);
B65G1/0421 (US);
B65G1/0492 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMISSIONIEREINRICHTUNG ZUM KOMMISSIONIEREN VON EINEM VORRATSBEHÄLTER IN EINEN AUFTRAGSBEHÄLTER UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2019/45] | English: | PICKING DEVICE FOR PICKING FROM A STORAGE CONTAINER INTO AN APPLICATION CONTAINER AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2019/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION DE COMMANDES PERMETTANT DE PRÉPARER LES COMMANDES D'UN RÉCIPIENT DE STOCKAGE DANS UN CONTENEUR DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 22.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0235488 (REDOUTE CATALOGUE SA [FR]) [Y] 1-9,13,14 * columns 1-28; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]DE102014111886 (STILL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,13* paragraph [0040] *; | [XY]DE102016008078 (SERVUS INTRALOGISTICS GMBH [AT]) [X] 10-12 * paragraphs [0129] - [0136]; figures 4-10 * [Y] 1-9,13,14; | [Y]US2018065806 (SUGAHARA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * sensor 6 * |