EP3570221 - NEURAL NETWORKS FOR DISCOVERING LATENT FACTORS FROM DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chhabra, Mohit c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1008280 / JP | 02 /
Klinkigt, Martin c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1008280 / JP | 03 /
Murakami, Tomokazu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1008280 / JP | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 19171496.3 | 29.04.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | JP20180094146 | 15.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018094146 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570221 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06F18/2113 (US);
G06F18/2148 (US);
G06F18/2155 (US);
G06N3/044 (US);
G06N5/022 (US);
G06N7/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEURONALE NETZE ZUM ENTDECKEN VON LATENTEN FAKTOREN AUS DATEN | [2019/47] | English: | NEURAL NETWORKS FOR DISCOVERING LATENT FACTORS FROM DATA | [2019/47] | French: | RÉSEAUX NEURONAUX POUR DÉCOUVRIR DES FACTEURS LATENTS À PARTIR DE DONNÉES | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 17.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2023 | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/44] | 24.06.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 18.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018085697 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** page 4, line 24 - page 4, line 32 *; | [I] - PASCAL VINCENT ET AL, "Extracting and composing robust features with denoising autoencoders", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MACHINE LEARNING, ICML '08, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20080705), doi:10.1145/1390156.1390294, ISBN 978-1-60558-205-4, pages 1096 - 1103, XP058106428 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1096, column left, line 1 - page 1099, column right, line 4 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1390156.1390294 | by applicant | US2017328194 |